Wahab v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Juliana Wahab
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation and The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv06097
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/3/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Juliana Wahab Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement (Attachments: #1 Declaration Unredacted Declaration of Clay Robbins III In Suport of Motion, #2 Exhibit (1) Unredacted CV Clay Robbins III, #3 Exhibit (2) Unredacted Retainer Agreement, #4 Exhibit (3) Unredacted Release, #5 Exhibit (4) Unredacted Heirship Rights, #6 Exhibit (5) Unredacted Signed Settlement Release, #7 Exhibit (6) Unredacted Costs Itemization, #8 Text of Proposed Order Unredacted Proposed Order Approving Joint Motion)(Robbins, Clay)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Unopposed Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #12 . Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/3/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Juliana Wahab to seal UNOPPOSED Motion to Seal Portions of Dkt #11 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting UNOPPOSED Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Portions of Dkt: 11)(Robbins, Clay)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Juliana Wahab for settlement Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement (Redacted Version) (Motion to Seal Pending) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clay Robbins In Support (Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit (1) Unredacted CV, #3 Exhibit (2) Redacted Version, #4 Exhibit (3) Redacted Version, #5 Exhibit (4) Redacted Version, #6 Exhibit (5) Redaction Version, #7 Exhibit (6) Redacted Version, #8 Text of Proposed Order Redacted Version)(Robbins, Clay)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/15/2020. (bg, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juliana Wahab by Clay Robbins, III (Robbins, Clay)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Clay Robbins III's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Juliana Wahab, Personal Representative of the Heirs to Hariyanto Kusuma #5 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/15/2020. Mailed notice. (bg, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juliana Wahab as to The Boeing Company on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Goldman, Ronald)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juliana Wahab by Michael Sean Krzak (Krzak, Michael)
October 14, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (cp, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17536988. (Robbins, Clay)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juliana Wahab by William Crawford Appleby (Appleby, William)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juliana Wahab by Ronald Laurence Goldman (Goldman, Ronald)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Goldman, Ronald)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Juliana Wahab; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17536380.(Goldman, Ronald)
October 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather M. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahab v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Wahab
Represented By: William Crawford Appleby
Represented By: Ronald Laurence Goldman
Represented By: Michael Sean Krzak
Represented By: Clay Robbins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?