McClintock v. National Collegiate Athletic Association
Plaintiff: Scott McClintock
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv06144
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (bg, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02501 (bg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on October 15, 2020. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 33. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter). (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff SCOTT MCCLINTOCK. (Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by SCOTT MCCLINTOCK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6202908) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClintock v. National Collegiate Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McClintock
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis Raizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?