Horn v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiny Horn
Defendant: Comcast Corporation, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. and Comcast of Illinois XI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06231
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Comcast of Illinois XI, LLC(LaBarge, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Comcast of Illinois XI, LLC by Jenna Marie Reinhardt (Reinhardt, Jenna)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Subpoena Deuces Tecum by Tiny Horn (Hyzy, Kurt)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.(Ozog, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Ozog, James)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Comcast of Illinois XI, LLC by Michael Raymond LaBarge (LaBarge, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiny Horn by Kurt D. Hyzy (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hyzy, Kurt)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tiny Horn by Mark Leonard Karno (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Apperance for Plaintiff Tiny Horn)(Karno, Mark)
October 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 JURY Demand (Ozog, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. by James W. Ozog (Ozog, James)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (20 L 8260) filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17562295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ozog, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Ozog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Illinois XI, LLC
Represented By: Jenna Marie Reinhardt
Represented By: Michael Raymond LaBarge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiny Horn
Represented By: Kurt D. Hyzy
Represented By: Mark Leonard Karno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?