Patel et al v. MS International, Inc.
Appellant: Pramod Patel and Ankit Shah
Appellee: MS International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06234
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS Report (Joint) by Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah (Chapin, Aaron)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Appellee shall file a response to Appellant's motion #7 by 12/31/20, and Appellant shall file any reply by 1/8/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee MS International, Inc. by James Kenneth Borcia (Borcia, James)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah re MOTION by Appellants Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah for Certification to 7th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 (Chapin, Aaron)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Appellants Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah for Certification to 7th Circuit Court of Appeals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion)(Chapin, Aaron)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellants Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah by Aaron B. Chapin Appearance of Alexander Terras (Chapin, Aaron)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellants Pramod Patel, Ankit Shah by Aaron B. Chapin (Chapin, Aaron)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter)(jh, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 12/14/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 740 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
October 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. MS International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pramod Patel
Represented By: Alexander Terras
Represented By: Aaron B. Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ankit Shah
Represented By: Alexander Terras
Represented By: Derrick B. Hager
Represented By: Aaron B. Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MS International, Inc.
Represented By: Katerina Tsoukalas-Heitkemper
Represented By: James Kenneth Borcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?