Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC et al v. Codal, Inc.
Plaintiff: RCC Investments, Inc. and Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Codal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06237
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. regarding Complaint, Summons served on Codal, Inc. on December 18, 2020 (Jayaram, Vivek)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 12/18/2020 and resets it to 2/2/2021 at 9:30 a.m., with a revised status report due by 1/26/2021. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for alternative service #13 and permits Plaintiff to effectuate service via email and certified mail on Defendant. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Vivek Jayaram for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Jayaram, Vivek)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc.Alternative Service (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jayaram, Vivek)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. (Jayaram, Vivek)
November 30, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Codal, Inc.. (jg, )
November 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Codal, Inc. (lxk, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 12/18/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/11/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Judge Ellis has reinstated the requirement that all motions must be noticed in accordance with Local Rule 5.3(b), despite suspension of that Rule by the Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012. Noticed motions will initially appear on the calendar as in-person hearings, but will be changed to phone conferences by subsequent minute order. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. to withdraw motion for disclosure #7 , motion for disclosure #6 Motion to Withdraw Inadvertently Filed Motions (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. for disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. for disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. by Palak Vinod Patel Attorney Appearance Form (Patel, Palak)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. by Elizabeth Ann Austermuehle Attorney Appearance Form (Austermuehle, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC, RCC Investments, Inc. by Vivek Jayaram Attorney Appearance Form (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jayaram, Vivek)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17563882.(Jayaram, Vivek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC et al v. Codal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCC Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Palak Vinod Patel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Austermuehle
Represented By: Vivek Jayaram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aerospace Data Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Vivek Jayaram
Represented By: Palak Vinod Patel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Austermuehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?