Eirich v. Eirich Machines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eirich Machines, Inc. and Bastian Eirich
Case Number: 1:2020cv06628
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Counter Defendant Bastian Eirich, Plaintiff Bastian Eirich for extension of time to file answer (Raab, Stephen)
December 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Eirich Machines, Inc. against Bastian Eirich . by Eirich Machines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malnar, Eric)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 1/6/2021, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 (a "status hearing," in local parlance) on 1/13/2021 at 9:40 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 12/24/2020. (mk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Eirich Machines, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Malnar, Eric)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eirich Machines, Inc. by Eric J. Malnar (Malnar, Eric)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bastian Eirich as to Eirich Machines, Inc. on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Raab, Stephen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bastian Eirich by Dennis A. Dressler (Dressler, Dennis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bastian Eirich by Stephen J. Raab (Raab, Stephen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Raab, Stephen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bastian Eirich; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17621417. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raab, Stephen)
November 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
November 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Eirich Machines, Inc. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eirich v. Eirich Machines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eirich Machines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bastian Eirich
Represented By: Stephen J. Raab
Represented By: Dennis A. Dressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?