Sylvestre et al v. The Performance Law Firm et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Geiger and Linda D Sylvestre
Defendant: The Performance Law Firm, Wellsfargo Sasco Mortgage Loan, V&T Investment Investment and McCalla Raymer Leibert Practice
Case Number: 1:2020cv06788
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 12/15/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 11/23/2020 order #6 gave Plaintiffs until 12/7/2020 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis application, and warned that failure to comply would result in the dismissal of this suit. Plaintiffs have not complied. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Enter judgment order. The status hearing set for 12/16/2020 #6 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiffs have until 12/7/2020 to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an in forma pauperis application. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this suit. Status hearing set for 12/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/2020.(ec, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiffs Linda D Sylvestre. (ec, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 3 copies by Stacey Geiger, Linda D Sylvestre. (Exhibits) (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvestre et al v. The Performance Law Firm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Performance Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellsfargo Sasco Mortgage Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V&T Investment Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Practice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda D Sylvestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?