Ursu v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Ion Ursu
Defendant: Kevin Riddle and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv06864
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion #4 was docketed in this case in error. It is stricken. The Clerk of Court is ordered to file document #4 in case no. 20-cv-6884. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/16/2020.Mailed notice (nsf, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kevin Riddle, Chad Wolf (Treacy, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kevin Riddle, Chad Wolf (Oswald, Craig)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS by Ion Ursu. (nsf, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Ion Ursu for attorney representation.(Exhibits) (nsf, )
November 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Kevin Riddle, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (kl, )
November 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ion Ursu by Lauren Elizabeth Mcclure (Mcclure, Lauren)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mcclure, Lauren)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Ion Ursu; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17663751.(Mcclure, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ursu v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ion Ursu
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Mcclure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?