Tapia v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Yoselin Tapia
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv06881
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by Defendant United States of America to motion to dismiss #4 United States' Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Arce, Jimmy)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Yoselin Tapia to United States' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moore, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yoselin Tapia by Michael Allen Moore (Moore, Michael)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #4 ). Plaintiff shall respond by December 22, 2020. Defendant shall reply by January 12, 2021. Defense counsel shall send a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding MOTION by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to dismiss United States' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies #4 , notice of motion #5 (Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce for presentment of motion to dismiss #4 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 12/1/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to dismiss United States' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020 L 008521) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certification)(Arce, Jimmy)
November 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoselin Tapia
Represented By: Michael Allen Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jimmy Lorenzo Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?