Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation et al v. Marvel Yarbrough
Plaintiff: Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation and Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation
Defendant: Marvel Yarbrough (a/k/a Burberry Jesus), Marvel Yarbrough and Burberry Jesus
Case Number: 1:2020cv06909
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation, Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation as to Marvel Yarbrough on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Natalie L. Arbaugh of Service of Other Filings (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Natalie L. Arbaugh (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3(b) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Attorney Natalie Arbaugh is added as counsel for plaintiffs. Mailed notice (ags)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17719299. (Arbaugh, Natalie)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/18/2021 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Marvel Yarbrough (a/k/a Burberry Jesus). (acm, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation (Mayer, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation (Mayer, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation by Kevin Paul Simpson (Simpson, Kevin)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation by Michael P Mayer (Mayer, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mayer, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation, Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17670545. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Request for Name Change, #3 Exhibit 2 - Instagram Post Chicago Water Tower, #4 Exhibit 3 - Burberry Jesus Monogram Car Instagram Post, #5 Exhibit 4 - Burberry Ltd. v. Perry Moise No. 16 Civ. 5943, #6 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Registration for 260843, #7 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Registration for 4212001, #8 Exhibit 7 - Certificate of Registration for 1133122, #9 Exhibit 8 - Certificate of Registration for 3879249, #10 Exhibit 9 - Certificate of Registration for 3898440, #11 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Registration for 2624684, #12 Exhibit 11 - Certificate of Registration for 2875336, #13 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Registration for 4714346, #14 Exhibit 13 - Certificate of Registration for 2015462, #15 Exhibit 14 - Certificate of Registration for 2022789, #16 Exhibit 15 - Certificate of Registration for 3529814, #17 Exhibit 16 - Certificate of Registration for 4123508, #18 Exhibit 17 - Certificate of Registration for 1241222, #19 Exhibit 18 - Certificate of Registration for 2845852, #20 Exhibit 19 - Certificate of Registration for 2612272, #21 Exhibit 20 - Certificate of Registration for 2728709, #22 Exhibit 21 - Certificate of Registration for 2732617, #23 Exhibit 22 - Certificate of Registration for Burberry Copyrighted Design, #24 Exhibit 23 - Instagram Story Screenshot Using Word Burberry, #25 Exhibit 24 - SoundCloud Screenshot of Song, #26 Exhibit 25 - Instagram Teaser Video on Feb 1 2019, #27 Exhibit 26 - Instagram Story Teaser of Single, #28 Exhibit 27 - burberryjesus.com Contact Page, #29 Exhibit 28 - SoundCloud Screenshot from 12-16-2019, #30 Exhibit 29 - Burberry Jesus YouTube Screenshot, #31 Exhibit 30 - Burberry Jesus with Car Instagram Post, #32 Exhibit 31 - Carscoops.com Article, #33 Exhibit 32 - Image of Car, #34 Exhibit 33 - burberryjesus.com, #35 Exhibit 34 - Burberry Jesus Facebook Profile, #36 Exhibit 35 - Burberry Jesus SoundCloud, #37 Exhibit 36 - Burberry Jesus Instagram, #38 Exhibit 37 - Burberry Jesus Facebook Page, #39 Exhibit 38 - Burberry Jesus Twitter, #40 Exhibit 39 - Champaign County Certified Documents, #41 Exhibit 40 - Will County Criminal Case, #42 Exhibit 41 - Certificate of Formation, #43 Exhibit 42 - New Music Video, #44 Exhibit 43 - Burberry Jesus Apple Music, #45 Exhibit 44 - Burberry Jesus Spotify, #46 Exhibit 45 - Burberry Fan Car, #47 Exhibit 46 - burberryjesusfan Instagram, #48 Exhibit 47 - Screenshots of Other Instagram Users)(Mayer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation et al v. Marvel Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Yarbrough (a/k/a Burberry Jesus)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burberry Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael P Mayer
Represented By: Natalie Lynn Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Paul Simpson
Represented By: Michael P Mayer
Represented By: Natalie Lynn Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?