Kipping et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Therese Kipping and Frederic (Nigel) Kipping
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06950
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. (aee, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion to stay case #12 is granted. This case is stayed until further order of the court. Status hearing is reset for 2/23/2021 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The parties shall file a joint written status report by 2/16/2021. The court will enter a scheduling order in response to the status report. If a stipulation to dismiss is submitted in advance of that date, the status hearing will be stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Melody N. Drummond Hansen for presentment of motion to stay #12 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
December 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. to stay case (Unopposed) (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Unopposed motion for 14-day extension of time to answer #7 pending transfer to MDL 2887 in the District of Kansas is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 1/25/2021. Mailed notice (reg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Frederic (Nigel) Kipping, Therese Kipping by Ryan D Johnson (Johnson, Ryan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17685753. (Chanoine, Hannah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Melody N. Drummond Hansen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/2/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. for extension of time to file answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. regarding civil cover sheet #3 , notice of removal, #1 , attorney appearance #2 , notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #4 (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. by Melody N. Drummond Hansen (Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois (Third District, Rolling Meadows), case number (2020-M3-004654) filed by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17675705. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint)(Drummond Hansen, Melody)
November 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kipping et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Melody N. Drummond Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Kipping
Represented By: Ryan D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederic (Nigel) Kipping
Represented By: Ryan D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?