Koronkiewicz et al
Plaintiff: Island Party Boat, LLC and Joseph Koronkiewicz
Case Number: 1:2020cv07275
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeanne E. Noonan, Esq., (ECF No. 9), to appear on behalf of Limitation Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz. Based on the Motion, and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is Granted, and Jeanne E. Noonan, Esq. of the law firm of Willcox Savage, P.C., is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Limitation Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/13/2021. Mailed notice (lma, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Abel, Esq., (ECF No. 8), to appear on behalf of Limitation Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz. Based on the Motion, and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is Granted, and Christopher A. Abel, Esq. of the law firm of Willcox Savage, P.C., is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Limitation Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/13/2021. Mailed notice (lma, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (bg, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 REVISED ORDER Accepting Security: Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/8/2021. Mailed notice. (bg, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 21 REVISED ORDER of Publication and Stay: Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/8/2021. Mailed notice. (bg, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Revised Motion for Order #19 is granted.Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 8, 2021 Registry BOND in the amount of $1,000.00 posted by Joseph Koronkiewicz, receipt no. 4624251014. (lma, )
January 8, 2021 Registry BOND in the amount of $41,000.00 posted by Island Party Boat, LLC, receipt no. 4624251013. (lma, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Island Party Boat, LLC, Joseph Koronkiewicz for order Revised Motion for Order to Approve Security and for Publication and Stay (Porter, David)
January 6, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION regarding complaint #1 Supplemental Ad Interim Stipulation for Value (Porter, David)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ACCEPTING SECURITY. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/16/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF PUBLICATION AND STAY. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/16/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Island Party Boat, LLC, Joseph Koronkiewicz to Motion to Approve Security and for Publication and Stay #7 (Porter, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ACCEPTING SECURITY. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/11/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF PUBLICATION AND STAY. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/11/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Limitation Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Security and for Publication and Stay #7 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Disclosure Statement by Island Party Boat, LLC (Slade, Randall)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Island Party Boat, LLC by Randall W Slade (Slade, Randall)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17727132. (Noonan, Jeanne)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17727102. (Abel, Christopher)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Island Party Boat, LLC, Joseph Koronkiewicz for order to Approve Security and for Publication and Stay (Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Costs (Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION regarding complaint #1 (Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz by Joseph R. Vallort (Vallort, Joseph)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Koronkiewicz by David William Porter (Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Koronkiewicz, Island Party Boat, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17723174.(Porter, David)
December 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koronkiewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Party Boat, LLC
Represented By: Randall W Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Koronkiewicz
Represented By: David William Porter
Represented By: Joseph R. Vallort
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Christopher Alan Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?