Remily et al v. Freedom Development Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darrel Remily and Randall Hansen
Defendant: Jet Park LLC, Daniel Olswang, Kim R. Denkewalter, Freedom Development Group LLC, 901 Center Street Holdings, LLC, Star Real Estate, LLC, JET Hospitals, LLC and John Thomas
Case Number: 1:2020cv07324
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 901 Center Street Holdings, LLC, Freedom Development Group LLC, JET Hospitals, LLC, Jet Park LLC, Daniel Olswang, Star Real Estate, LLC, John Thomas by Jeffrey A. Schulman (Schulman, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 2/24/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc).
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Randall Hansen, Darrel Remily by Juan M. Soliz (Soliz, Juan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darrel Remily; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17730615. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Soliz, Juan)
December 11, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Remily et al v. Freedom Development Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Remily
Represented By: Juan M. Soliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Hansen
Represented By: Juan M. Soliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Park LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Olswang
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim R. Denkewalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Development Group LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 901 Center Street Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JET Hospitals, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?