Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. v. Tiresocks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc.
Defendant: Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks, Inc. and Tiresocks International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07404
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 Agreed (Buxbaum, Jeremy)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: A notice of voluntary dismissal (Dkt. #12 ) has been filed. This case against individual defendant Jarrett Gordon is dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Mailed notice. (dm, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. of Defendant Jarrett Gordon (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Elizabeth M. Manno #8 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Sabrina J. Danielson #9 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17819820. (Danielson, Sabrina)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Appearance by Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. (RECEIPT # 0752-17819594) (Manno, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAYMENT by Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. of Pro Hac Fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17819594. (Manno, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. by Jeremy L. Buxbaum (Buxbaum, Jeremy)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarrett Gordon, Tiresocks International, Inc., Tiresocks, Inc. by Thomas Lee Holt (Holt, Thomas)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 3/1/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. by Genna S Hibbs (Hibbs, Genna)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hibbs, Genna)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17741346. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Claims to Director, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exbt ABCDEFGH, #5 Exhibit Exbt I part 1, #6 Exhibit Exbt I part 2, #7 Exhibit Exbt JK, #8 Exhibit Exbt LMNO, #9 Exhibit Exbt PQRST, #10 Attorney Appearance, #11 Notice of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service, #12 Supplement Blank Waiver forms for all three Defendants)(Hibbs, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc. v. Tiresocks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrett Gordon
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Manno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiresocks, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Manno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiresocks International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Represented By: Thomas Lee Holt
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Manno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tireboots by Universal Canvas, Inc.
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Manno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?