United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv07414
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by United States of Americain Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 1 - Government's Verified Complaint)(Bond, Aaron)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #6 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 2/1/2021. Defendant shall reply by 2/16/2021. Initial status hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 2/19/2021. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit)(Abdallah, Zaid)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency by Zaid Mahmoud Abdallah (Abdallah, Zaid)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT for ARREST IN REM issued as to Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States Currency (bg, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Aaron Richard Bond as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Bond, Aaron)
December 16, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bond, Aaron)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Bond, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $350,000 in United States currency
Represented By: Zaid Mahmoud Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Richard Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?