Johnson v. Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prentice S. Johnson
Defendant: Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07462
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Preliminary settlement discussion held. A telephonic settlement conference is scheduled for April 7, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Parties are ordered to review and follow the court's standing order on "Settlement Conferences" on its webpage. The individuals with the authority to settle this matter must be present by phone for the duration of the conference. Plaintiff to provide a written settlement position statement to Defendant, with a copy to the court (settlement_statement_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov), by March 5, 2021. Defendant to respond in writing, with a copy to the court, by March 19, 2021. Defendant must also provide a draft settlement and release to Plaintiff along with its position statement so that Plaintiff is advised of the collateral terms Defendant requires to resolve this matter. These settlement position statements are not to be filed with the clerk's office. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A preliminary settlement discussion with the attorneys of record is scheduled for February 11, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to settlement conference.(cdh, )Emailed notice.
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Telephone conference held. At the request of the parties, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to settlement conference. Emailed notice (cdh, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the joint status report #8 filed on 1/29/2021, the telephonic status hearing set for 2/3/2021 at 9:00 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. Participants are reminded to use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS Report Joint by Prentice S. Johnson (Lefkow-Hynes, Laura)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc. by Michael A. Wilder (Wilder, Michael)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc. by Jennifer Lynn Jones (Jones, Jennifer)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Prentice S. Johnson. Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc. waiver sent on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Prinz, Kristen)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 2/3/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
December 21, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc. (crl, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prentice S. Johnson by Laura B Lefkow-Hynes (Lefkow-Hynes, Laura)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prentice S. Johnson by Kristen E. Prinz (Prinz, Kristen)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Prentice S. Johnson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17753114. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Prinz, Kristen)
December 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prentice S. Johnson
Represented By: Laura B Lefkow-Hynes
Represented By: Kristen E. Prinz
Represented By: Laura Lefkow-Hynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Thermoplastic Alloys & Rubbers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Wilder
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?