Vueluas v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Vueluas
Defendant: David Gomez and Stateville Correctional Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv07465
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION and Affidavit by Plaintiff Daniel Vueluas to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs. (Attachments) (lma, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01297(nsf,)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2020. (ksp) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/17/2020.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 20-1297-SMY. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/4/2020. (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/17/2020.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 12/4/2020. Consent due by 12/28/2020 (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/17/2020.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Daniel Vueluas.(jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 12/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vueluas v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Vueluas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?