Boedeker et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Boedeker and Craig D Boedeker
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Orthopaedics, Smith & Nephew Inc and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv07521
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending dates before this court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice (Monroe, Stephen)
January 18, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Craig D Boedeker, Deborah Boedeker by Stephen Frederick Monroe (Monroe, Stephen)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The parties have agreed to the following briefing schedule on the motion to dismiss #9 . Plaintiff's response is due by 1/20/2021. Defendant's reply is due by 2/3/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Smith & Nephew Inc in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Grzanecki Case)(Bidzinski, Joshua)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Smith & Nephew Inc (Bidzinski, Joshua)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith & Nephew Inc by Maura Jane Ashe (Ashe, Maura)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 2/26/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith & Nephew Inc by Anthony Joseph Monaco (Monaco, Anthony)
December 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Smith & Nephew Inc Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Affiliates (Bidzinski, Joshua)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bidzinski, Joshua)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith & Nephew Inc by Joshua Erik Bidzinski (Bidzinski, Joshua)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020 L 010277) filed by Smith & Nephew Inc Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17758600. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Process Served on Defendant)(Bidzinski, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boedeker et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Orthopaedics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Monaco
Represented By: Joshua Erik Bidzinski
Represented By: Maura Jane Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Boedeker
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig D Boedeker
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?