Clemons v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Booker Clemons
Defendant: Cook County Criminal Courts, City of Chicago, Secter Dermer, Westerfield and Pentimore
Case Number: 1:2020cv07639
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 MAILED Copy of order #5 , and a blank application to proceed In Forma Pauperis to Ryan B. Clemons. (jn, )
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court denies Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants the Court to screen his complaint, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $402; or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the statement section of this order. Failure to comply by February 25, 2021, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 , which indicates that he has contacted only one lawyer, is denied without prejudice as his effort is inadequate, see Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019), and in any event, nothing suggests that that he cannot respond to this order on his own by providing basic financial information using a form designed for unrepresented inmates. Plaintiff must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If he fails to comply, this case will be subject to summary dismissal with no further warning. The Court directs the Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of this order and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/28/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Ryan Booker Clemons for attorney representation (daj, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ryan Booker Clemons for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (daj, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and zero copies by Ryan Booker Clemons (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (daj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2020: #1 Envelope) (daj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Criminal Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secter Dermer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Booker Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?