United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $534,040 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $534,040 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv07774
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion by Fred A. Schwartz for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/24/2021. Mailed notice (nsf, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funds in the amount of $534,040 in United States Currency by Fred A. Schwartz (Schwartz, Fred)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held on 2/24/2021. Briefing schedule: Motion to suppress due by 3/10/2021; Government's response due by 3/31/2021; Defendant's reply is due by 4/7/2021. Discovery schedule: Rule 26(a) disclosures are due by 3/10/2021; written discovery to issue by 3/24/2021; fact discovery closes on 6/30/2021. Next status date set for 7/7/2021 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on motion to suppress. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States of America (Daniel, Jeremy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17933460. (Schwartz, Fred)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 2/17/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM as to funds in the amount of $534,040 WARRANT issued. (jh, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Jeremy C. Daniel as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Daniel, Jeremy)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for forfeiture filed by United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Daniel, Jeremy)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Daniel, Jeremy)
December 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $534,040 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $534,040 in United States Currency
Represented By: Fred A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy C. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?