Conner v. City Of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Conner
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO, Steven Spremo and Donald Clark
Case Number: 1:2020cv07824
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY by Donald Clark, Steven Spremo to response in opposition to motion #14 (Shine, Nathan)
February 15, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Curtis Connerin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants City Of Chicago, Donald Clark, Steven Spremo #10 (Marx, Jason)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Donald Clark, Steven Spremo by Jennifer Kristine Bagby (Bagby, Jennifer)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The motion (No. #10 ) of defendants Donald Clark and Steven Spremo for partial dismissal of the complaint is briefed as follows: response due: 2/16/2021; reply due: 2/23/2021. The court will rule by mail. The deadline of 3/3/2021 to file an initial status report shall stand. Mailed notice (mjc, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , and Affirmative Defenses by City Of Chicago, Donald Clark, Steven Spremo(Shine, Nathan)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants City Of Chicago, Donald Clark, Steven Spremo (Perrone, Nicholas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Donald Clark, Steven Spremo by Nicholas John Perrone (Perrone, Nicholas)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Donald Clark, Steven Spremo by Nathan A. Shine (Shine, Nathan)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Curtis Conner. City Of Chicago waiver sent on 12/31/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Marx, Jason)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Nathan A. Shine (Shine, Nathan)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before March 3, 2021. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Eighth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/7/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, )
January 4, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marx, Jason)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Curtis Conner by Jason Michael Marx (Marx, Jason)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marx, Jason)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Conner; jury demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17789250.(Marx, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Nicholas John Perrone
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Spremo
Represented By: Nicholas John Perrone
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Clark
Represented By: Nicholas John Perrone
Represented By: Jennifer Kristine Bagby
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Conner
Represented By: Jason Michael Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?