World Fuel Services, Inc. v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services, Inc.
Defendant: City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2020cv07836
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of page limit #26 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for leave to file excess pages (Chung, Christina)
February 22, 2021 Filing 25 CONFIDENTIALITY AND FRE 502(D) AND (E) CLAWBACK ORDER: Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 2/22/2021. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 22, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Plaintiff's joint motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #23 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. for protective order (Joint Motion) (Brown, Stephen)
February 18, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Magistrate status hearing held. Parties appeared telephonically and reported on the status of discovery for the preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff's counsel advised the Court that Plaintiff recently served contention interrogatories on the City of Chicago as previously allowed by this Court. (See dkt. #21 .) Parties reported that they have agreed to custodians and ESI search terms. By COB on 2/19/21, parties shall file a motion for entry of a protective order and send the proposed protective order to Proposed_Order_Weisman@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Parties shall use the redline function of Word so the Court can review changes to the standard Northern District of Illinois protective order if the parties choose to use the standard order. By 3/4/21, parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court as to the status of discovery for the preliminary injunction hearing. A telephonic status hearing is set for 3/10/21 at 9:15 a.m. The conference call- in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. If the parties state in their joint status report that all discovery issues have been resolved, the status hearing will be stricken. As discussed, due to the current health pandemic and the Tenth Amended General Order 20-0012, today's court hearing was not recorded on the court's recording system. Therefore, this order will serve as the official record. See 28 U.S.C. 753(b). If the parties believe this order should be corrected or expanded upon, they may visit this Court's webpage for more information. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 16, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Magistrate status hearing held. Parties appeared telephonically and reported on the status of expedited discovery as it relates to the upcoming Preliminary Injunction hearing. Parties advised the Court that they have met and conferred and were able resolve most issues, but two issues remain. First, the City objects to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests, Interrogatory No. 4, Request for Production #3, and Request for Admission No. 24 (requests related to Amit Gauri and Black Dog). (Dkt. 15-1 at 2, 4, 6.) The Court heard oral argument on these issues. Following argument, the Court finds that these Interrogatories and the RFA are relevant based on the allegations in Plaintiff's complaint and for purposes of the Preliminary Injunction hearing. Over the City's objection, the City shall answer these Interrogatories and RFA as follows: the timeframe shall be limited to January 2019 thru the date the contract at issue was awarded; the parties advised the Court that they will work towards an agreement as to the scope of the search, including the number of custodians and how the parties intend to conduct relevant searches. The parties shall also meet and confer regarding any affidavits required as to the limited discovery process. Second, the City objects to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests, Request for Admission Nos. 35 38. (Dkt. 15-1 at 8.) Following oral argument, and without objection, Plaintiff has advised the Court that it will withdraw these RFAs. Plaintiff is given leave to serve 4 contention interrogatories to address those issues originally contained in the four RFA's that have been withdrawn. A telephonic status hearing is set for 2/18/21 at 2:30 p.m. The conference call-in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. Please note that the Court's conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the Court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called by the Court. Once the Court has heard your case you shall disconnect from the conference line. As discussed, due to the current health pandemic and the Tenth Amended General Order 20-0012, today's court hearing was not recorded on the court's recording system. Therefore, this order will serve as the official record. See 28 U.S.C. 753(b). If the parties believe this order should be corrected or expanded upon, they may visit this Court's webpage for more information. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Magistrate status hearing held. Parties appeared telephonically and discussed the status of discovery. Status hearing was continued until 3:00 p.m. to allow consultation with the district court. After consulting with the district court, the briefing schedule as to the preliminary injunction is modified as follows: defendant's response is due by 3/1/21; plaintiff's reply is due by 3/8/21. Hearing date for the for the preliminary injunction remains 3/22/21 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are to meet and confer as to the issues raised in the joint status report as to the limited discovery allowed in advance of the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court sets a status hearing for 2/16/21 at 2:00 p.m. to address any discovery issues that the parties have not been able to resolve. The conference call-in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. Please note that the Court's conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the Court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called by the Court. Once the Court has heard your case you shall disconnect from the conference line. As discussed, due to the current health pandemic and the Ninth Amended General Order 20-0012, today's court hearing was not recorded on the court's recording system. Therefore, this order will serve as the official record. See 28 U.S.C. 753(b). If the parties believe this order should be corrected or expanded upon, they may visit this Court's webpage for more information. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 STATUS Report (Joint) by City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kauffman, Cornel)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman for the purposes of discovery supervision. Status hearing set for 2/11/21 at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to file a joint status report with a proposal for the limited discovery allowed for the preliminary injunction hearing by COB 2/10/21. Parties shall dial in using the Court's conference call-in number. The conference call-in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. Please note that the Court's conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the Court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called by the Court. Once the Court has heard your case you shall disconnect from the conference line. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable M. David Weisman for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Over defendant's objections, plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery #15 is granted. Limited discovery is appropriate in advance of preliminary injunction hearings. See Ezell v. City of Chicago, 651 F.3d 684, 692 (7th Cir. 2011). The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman for the purpose of monitoring the limited discovery prior to the preliminary injunction hearing. Judge Weisman will rule on plaintiff's suggested discovery schedule. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. for discovery on an expedited basis in advance of preliminary injunction hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Discovery, #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 3-4, 2021 Email Chain)(Esbrook, Christopher)
January 30, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: On the Court's own motion, the orders entered at Dkt. #12 and #13 are clarified as follows. Defendant's oral motion to dismiss for failure to join under Rule 19(a) is denied for reasons stated in open court. The Plaintiff's motion for TRO at Dkt #5 is denied per the memorandum/opinion at Dkt. #13 . The Court enters a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction as set forth at Dkt. #12 . All dates therein remain the same. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/29/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 1/29/2021. Oral arguments held as to plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction #5 . Prior to the TRO presentation, defendant orally moved to dismiss the action for failure to join a necessary party under Fed. R. Civ. Pr. 19(a). After hearing arguments and reviewing caselaw relied on, the Court denies the motion for reasons stated in open court. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. In regard to a preliminary injunction, response to be filed by 2/19/2021. Reply to be filed by 3/1/2021. Preliminary Injunction hearing is set for 3/22/2021 at 10:30 AM and will proceed by video conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 1-872-703-5321, then enter 577768062#. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Counsel of record is to have a cell phone available in case any technical or connection issues occur during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Fiona A Burke (Burke, Fiona)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Christina Chung (Chung, Christina)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Cornel Hershel Kauffman (Kauffman, Cornel)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by World Fuel Services, Inc.. City of Chicago waiver sent on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Esbrook, Christopher)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction #5 is set for 1/29/2021 at 11:30 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by World Fuel Services, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Esbrook, Christopher)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. for temporary restraining order and/or, MOTION by Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Esbrook, Christopher)
January 13, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Chicago. (ng, )
December 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. by Stephen Robert Brown (Brown, Stephen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff World Fuel Services, Inc. by Christopher J. Esbrook (Esbrook, Christopher)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Esbrook, Christopher)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by World Fuel Services, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17789990. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Esbrook, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Fuel Services, Inc. v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Christina Chung
Represented By: Fiona A Burke
Represented By: Cornel Hershel Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Robert Brown
Represented By: Christopher J. Esbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?