United States of America v. Galicia
Plaintiff: Mr. Daniel Galicia and United States of America
Defendant: Daniel Galicia
Case Number: 1:2021cv00021
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #8 is granted. The deadline for the Government to respond to Defendant's Section 2255 motion #1 is extended to 3/18/2021; Defendant may reply by 4/1/2021. The status hearing set for 3/29/2021 #7 is stricken and re-set for 4/9/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for extension of time (Murphy, Madeleine)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #6 is granted. The deadline for the Government to respond to Defendant's Section 2255 motion #1 is extended to 3/4/2021; Defendant may reply by 3/18/2021. The motion hearing set for 2/26/2021 #3 is stricken and re-set for 3/29/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for extension of time (Murphy, Madeleine)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Madeleine Sullivan Murphy as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Murphy, Madeleine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Kristen Totten as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Totten, Kristen)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Government shall respond to Defendant's Section 2255 motion #1 by 2/2/2021; Defendant shall reply by 2/16/2021. Motion hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 9:45 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 5, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (Winslow, Heather)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-17793254. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum to Petition)(Winslow, Heather) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/5/2021 (bg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Galicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Daniel Galicia
Represented By: Heather L. Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kristen Totten
Represented By: Madeleine Sullivan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Galicia
Represented By: Heather L. Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?