United States of America v. Turner
Plaintiff: Harvey Turner and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00129
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Madeleine Sullivan Murphy as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Murphy, Madeleine)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The government is directed to file a response to defendant Harvey Turner's motion under 28 USC 2255 by 3/17/2021. Mr. Turner is directed to file a reply to the response by 3/31/2021. The case is set for a status hearing on 4/5/2021 at 9:00 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, conference code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Harvey Turner Memorandum in Support of Mr. Turner's 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 Petition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Biala, Anjali)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Harvey Turner (Criminal Case No. 04 CR 930) has filed a pro se motion under 28 USC 2255 that purports to have been filed just within the one-year limitations period for section 2255 motions assuming that Mr. Turner has calculated the starting date correctly. But Mr. Turner's motion states no grounds for relief other than a bare-bones statement that imposition of a mandatory minimum sentence was inappropriate. The motion also states that a supporting memorandum will be filed. No such memorandum has been filed yet. Mr. Turner is advised to get his memorandum on file as quickly as possible and seta s deadline of 2/16/2021 for filing the memorandum. The Court expresses no view at this point whether his section 2255 motion will be considered timely in view of the fact that no grounds are stated in the only arguably timely filing he has made. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings. Honorable Jorge L. Alonso no longer assigned to the case. Local Rule 40.3. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/19/2021. (jn, )
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Harvey Turner Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (04-cr-930-1). (Biala, Anjali) Modified on 1/11/2021 (lma, ).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Harvey Turner by Anjali Biala (Biala, Anjali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Turner
Represented By: Anjali Biala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Madeleine Sullivan Murphy
Represented By: John D. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?