In Re: Clearview AI, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation
Plaintiff: John McPherson, Rosemary Arias, Sean Burke, Chris Marron, Maryann Daker, Ryan Balfanz, Benjamin Jais, Jennifer Rocio, Anthony Hall, Shelby Zelonis Roberson, Aimee Albrecht, David Mutnick, Maria Broccolino, James Pomerene, Mario Calderon, Dean John, All Plaintiffs, Aaron Hurvitz, Andrea Vestrand, Consolidated Mutnick Plaintiffs, Steven Vance, Isela Carmean, Steven Renderos, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa Knox, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund and Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas
Defendant: Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC, Hoan Ton-That, Jose Flores, Richard Schwartz, David Andalcio, Clearview AI, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Thomas Mulcaire, Macy's, Inc., City of Antioch, County of Alameda, CITY OF EL SGUNDO, City of El Segundo, Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc., Macy's Corporate Services, Inc., AT&T Inc., Kohl's, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Walmart Inc. and The Home Depot, Inc.
In Re: Clearview AI, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation
Amicus Curiae: Duke Law First Amendment Clinic, Professor Eugene Volokh, Professor Jane Bambauer, Center on Privacy & Technology, Electronic Frontier Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2021cv00135
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court, in its discretion, denies defendants' motion for reconsideration, but grants the motion for clarification, namely, that Mulcaire remains a defendant to this lawsuit #307 . The Court also denies defendants' request for oral argument on their motion for reconsideration because it is unnecessary #333 . Before filing any further reconsideration motions in this lawsuit, the parties must first seek leave from the Court to do so. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/25/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Leave to Amend the MDL Complaint and Various Underlying Complaints) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Drury, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #360 #361 is denied. Plaintiffs complain that the entity Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. has responded to Plaintiffs' discovery requests, despite the fact that the entity Macy's, Inc. is the Macy's entity that is named as a Defendant in the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #116 . The Court finds Plaintiffs' grievance in that regard unavailing. Despite complaining that Macy's, Inc. has not provided discovery responses, the interrogatories and requests for production Plaintiffs have attached to their motion are not directed to Macy, Inc., but rather are directed to Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC [361-1] [361-2]. Further, despite complaining that Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. provided the discovery responses, Plaintiffs have now moved for leave to amend their complaint to add that entity as a Defendant #351 . Finally, there is no indication that Macy's discovery responses would be any different if they came from Macy's, Inc. as opposed to Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. Plaintiffs also complain that Macy's has limited its discovery responses to Macy's stores in Illinois, New York, and California. However, the Court finds Macy's limitation in that regard to be appropriate, given that Plaintiffs' current claims are predicated solely on the state laws of those three states. See Miner v. Gov't Payment Serv., Inc., No. 14-cv-7474, 2017 WL 3909508, at *5 (N.D. Ill. Sept. 5, 2017) ("[T]he factual allegations of the [putative class action] complaint, confined as they are to Cook County transactions, do not support further discovery as to any other counties."). Further, the Court agrees with Macy's that forcing Macy's to gather discovery for its stores located in forty-three other jurisdictions where Plaintiffs do not allege claims would be unreasonably burdensome. As to the specific discovery requests raised by Plaintiffs, in response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 3, 4, 6, 10, 11, 13, 14, 41, and 42, Macy's has already agreed to produce documents within Macy's possession pertaining to its use of Clearview's web-based software environment, including URLs, complaints, contracts, trainings, and communications with governmental bodies. Further, in response to Interrogatory No. 21, Macy's has agreed to provide documents which identify the retail stores in Illinois, New York, and California from which Macy's uploaded an image to Clearview's web-based software environment. The Court finds that the productions Macy's has agreed to make are sufficient to satisfy its discovery obligations. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Relevant Time Period for Discovery and to Compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #383 is due by 8/5/22 and Plaintiffs' reply is due by 8/12/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Various Documents Under Seal #382 is granted. Plaintiffs may file the referenced declaration and Exhibits 26, 29, and 30 thereto under seal. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Declaration of Scott R. Drury) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30)(Drury, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury regarding motion to compel #383 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 (Filed Under Seal), #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29 (Filed Under Seal), #30 Exhibit 30 (Filed Under Seal), #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(Drury, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel (Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Relevant Time Period for Discovery and to Compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery) (Drury, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Various Documents Under Seal) (Drury, Scott)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion to compel, #361 , Sealed motion #360 (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE by Eric H. Gibbs of Change of Address (Gibbs, Eric)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE by David Michael Berger of Change of Address (Berger, David)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE by Macy's, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #361 Macy's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Saeedi, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the Clearview defendants oppose plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the MDL complaint and various underlying complaints, the Court strikes its 7/7/22 minute entry granting plaintiffs' motion. Plaintiffs' reply is due 7/21. The Court removes the documents at docket numbers 368, 369, 370, 371, 372, 373, 374, and 375. The Court will inform the parties if an oral argument is necessary as to plaintiffs' motion once the motion is fully briefed. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 RESPONSE by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to motion hearing,,, terminate hearings,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,, #355 / The Clearview Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the MDL Complaint and Various Underlying Complaints (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 DOCUMENT removed per court order. (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/8/2022.) (ym, ).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Minute entry 365 is corrected as follows: Because defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. withdraws it opposition to plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the MDL complaint and various underlying complaints, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion [350, 351] and strikes the oral argument date of 8/2/22. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Minute entry #365 is corrected as follows: Because defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. withdraws it opposition to plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the MDL complaint and various underlying complaints, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion [350, 351] and strikes the oral argument date of 8/2/22. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 RESPONSE by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to motion for leave to file, #351 Macy's Withdrawal of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (Saeedi, Daniel)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant Macy's, Inc.'s response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #360 #361 is due by 7/8/22 and Plaintiffs' reply is due by 7/15/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #359 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their motion to compel and Exhibits 10-12 thereto under seal. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), #11 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal), #12 Exhibit 12 (filed under seal))(Drury, Scott)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12)(Drury, Scott)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery Under Seal (Drury, Scott)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report on Discovery #357 . The parties are to file a further joint status report by 8/4/22. The status report shall be filed by 12:00 p.m. on that date. The Court will set a status hearing at a later date if it deems that to be necessary. The parties are strongly encouraged to work through any discovery disputes so as to obviate the need for Court intervention. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 STATUS Report / Joint Status Report on Discovery by Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Plaintiffs' Answer and Affirmative Defense to Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by All Plaintiffs (Drury, Scott)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 6/14/2022. Defendants to file a response to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint [350,351] by 7/7/2022. Plaintiffs to file a reply by 7/21/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Telephone status hearing set for 6/17/2022 is stricken. Oral arguments are set to 8/2/2022 at 10:00 AM. As this Court's website directs, the parties must provide courtesy copies in hard copy form of all substantive and/or dispositive motions, including the corresponding legal briefs and attachments. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the MDL complaint and various underlying complaints #351 set for 6/14/2022 at 10:15 AM will proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal their forthcoming motion for leave to amend the MDL complaint and various underlying complaints #349 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Robert Drury for presentment of motion to seal #349 , Sealed motion, #350 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/14/2022 at 10:15 AM. (Drury, Scott)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the MDL Complaint and Various Underlying Complaints) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Drury, Scott)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the MDL Complaint and Various Underlying Complaints) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Drury, Scott)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to seal Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Leave to Amend the MDL Complaint and Various Underlying Complaints (Drury, Scott)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/17/2022 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 43127. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2022. (Mccullough, Tracey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER: The Court, in its discretion, denies plaintiffs' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) motion to strike paragraphs 17 through 21 of defendants' counterclaim #330 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/2/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's, Inc. by Paul John Yovanic, Jr (Yovanic, Paul)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Drury, Scott)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion to strike, #330 (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in the Counterclaim of Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.) (Drury, Scott)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE by Clearview AI, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to strike answer to amended complaint,,, counterclaim,, #310 (Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in the Counterclaim of Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.) #330 (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Cases)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing is set for 6/17/2022 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The parties must file a joint status report by no later than 5/31/22 addressing the effects of the settlement agreement submitted to the Circuit Court of Cook County, 2020 CH 04353, in ACLU v. Clearview AI, on the present lawsuit. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas re order on motion to remand,,,,,,,, memorandum opinion and order, #315 of Withdrawal (Zota, Sejal)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas re order on motion to remand,,,,,,,, memorandum opinion and order, #315 of Withdrawal of Attorney (Zinsou, Tracy)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas re order on motion to remand,,,,,,,, memorandum opinion and order, #315 of Withdrawal of Attorney (Raj Ghosh, Pratik)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas re order on motion to remand,,,,,,,, memorandum opinion and order, #315 of Withdrawal of Attorney (Leonida, Ellen)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas re order on motion to remand,,,,,,,, memorandum opinion and order, #315 of Withdrawal (Senia, Amy)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That's motion for oral argument on their motion for reconsideration and clarification of points in the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and partial motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction #333 is taken under advisement. No appearance necessary on 4/21/2022. Defendants to file a response to plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) motion to strike certain allegations in the counterclaim of defendant Clearview AI, Inc. #330 on or before 5/13/2022. Plaintiffs to file a reply on or before 5/27/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. No appearance necessary on 4/19/2022. As this Court's website directs, the parties must provide courtesy copies in hard copy form of all substantive and/or dispositive motions, including the corresponding legal briefs and attachments. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Motion by Precious S. Jacobs-Perry for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #333 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/21/2022 at 10:15 AM. (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for Oral Argument on their Motion for Reconsideration (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in support of motion for reconsideration, #307 and Clarification of Points in the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum Opinion and Order and Partial Motion to Dismiss Counts 3-4, 8-12, and 14 for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel Kurtzberg, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Robert Drury for presentment of motion to strike, #330 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/19/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Drury, Scott)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to strike answer to amended complaint,,, counterclaim,, #310 (Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in the Counterclaim of Defendant Clearview AI, Inc.) (Drury, Scott)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court has reviewed the parties' status report. They are strongly encouraged to continue meeting and conferring to resolve their discovery disputes without the need for judicial assistance. The fact discovery deadline is extended to 9/26/22. This is the FINAL extension. A further joint status report is due by 6/17/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorneys Joseph P. Guglielmo, Erin Green Comite and Carey Alexander's motion for leave to withdraw appearances #327 is granted. Attorney Joseph Peter Guglielmo, Carey Alexander, and Erin Green Comite terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MOTION by Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo, Erin Green Comite, and Carey Alexander to withdraw as attorney for Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene. No party information provided (Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report on Discovery) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 RESPONSE by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to provisionally file under seal their forthcoming opposition to Clearview defendants' motion for reconsideration and clarification of the Court's February 14, 2022 memorandum opinion and order and partial motion to dismiss #319 is granted. No appearance necessary on 4/12/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury regarding sealed response,, #322 (Drury, Scott)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SEALED RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs to MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for reconsideration / Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of Points in the Court' #307 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum and Opinion Order and Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 7)(Drury, Scott)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to motion for reconsideration, #307 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum and Opinion Order and Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Drury, Scott)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Robert Drury for presentment of motion to seal, #319 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Drury, Scott)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to seal (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Provisionally File Under Seal Their Forthcoming Opposition to Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum and Opinion Order and Partial Motion to Dismiss and Two Exhibits Related Thereto) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Jason Rozbruch's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #317 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19296922. (Rozbruch, Jason)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ANSWER to amended complaint Macy's Answer to First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Macy's, Inc.(Schaller, Rachel)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants the Renderos plaintiffs' motion to remand under 28 U.S.C. 1447(e) #192 . The Court denies the municipal defendants' motions for a judicial determination of fraudulent joinder, but grants their motions to remand [192, 209, 210, 211]. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/23/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court, in its discretion, denies Macy's motion to certify an interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) #283 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/18/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 3/17/2022. Plaintiffs to file a response to the Clearview defendants' motion for reconsideration #307 on or before 4/7/2022. Defendants to file a reply on or before 4/14/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Counsel for plaintiffs made the Court aware that defendants filed a counterclaim with their answer #310 . Plaintiffs to file a responsive pleading to the counterclaim by 4/14/2022. Defendants also notified the Court that her clients are considering selling the app platform to other entities. The Court will discuss the sale of Clearview's app at an upcoming status hearing once defendant discloses more details of the sale to plaintiffs' counsel. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 REPLY by Macy's, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion #284 , MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc.Certify for Immediate Appeal Certain Questions Arising from the Court's January 27, 2022 Order #283 , memorandum in opposition to motion, #306 Macy's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Certify for Immediate Appeal Certain Questions Arising From The Court's January 27, 2022 Order (Saeedi, Daniel)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That's motion for reconsideration and clarification of points in the Court's February 14, 2022 memorandum opinion and order, and partial motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction #307 set for 3/17/2022 at 1:45 PM will proceed as an in-person hearing in courtroom 1241. Lead counsel for defendants, Precious S. Jacobs-Perry and lead counsel for plaintiffs, Scott Drury are to be present in the courtroom. All other counsel of record may call in to the teleconference line at 1-877-336-1829, access code 5205245. Status hearing set for 3/28/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ANSWER to amended complaint / The Clearview Defendants' Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Counterclaim for a Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Hoan Ton-That, Richard Schwartz against Mario Calderon, Isela Carmean, Anthony Hall, Aaron Hurvitz, David Mutnick, Shelby Zelonis Roberson, Steven Vance, Andrea Vestrand . by Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Hoan Ton-That, Richard Schwartz(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Motion by Precious S. Jacobs-Perry for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #307 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/17/2022 at 01:45 PM. (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in support of motion for reconsideration, #307 / Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of Points in the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and Partial Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration of Joel Kurtzberg)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for reconsideration / Clearview Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of Points in the Court's February 14, 2022 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and Partial Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief #283 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Macy's, Inc.'s Motion to Certify for Immediate Appeal Certain Questions Arising from the Court's January 27, 2022 Order) (Drury, Scott)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/23/2022 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 42692. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer the first amended complaint #302 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed on or before 3/14/2022. No appearance necessary on 3/7/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Motion by Precious S. Jacobs-Perry for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #302 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/7/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for extension of time to file answer to First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That's motion for extension of time to answer the first amended complaint #299 is stricken for failure to comply with LR 5.3 and this Court's standing orders, which require all motions to be noticed up for presentment before this Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESPONSE by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion for extension of time to file answer, #299 (Drury, Scott)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for extension of time to file answer / Clearview Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Status Report on Discovery #297 . The parties are to file a joint status report on discovery by 4/13/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report on Discovery) by All Plaintiffs (Drury, Scott)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court denies defendants' motions to strike plaintiffs' reply filed on December 28, 2021 because according to the Court's docket entry of October 28, 2021, the replies for the motions to remand were due on December 29, 2021 [248, 249, 250]. In other words, the reply was timely filed. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 2/23/2022. Plaintiffs to file a response to defendant Macy's, Inc.'s motion to certify for immediate appeal certain questions arising from the Court's January 27, 2022, order #283 on or before 3/9/2022. Defendant Macy's to file a reply on or before 3/16/2022. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Counsel for plaintiffs brought to the Court's attention the issue of staying this matter as to defendant Macy's, Inc. while the parties brief the motion to certify, the Court clarified that the matter will not be stayed, and the parties should proceed with the case. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court has determined that Defendant Macy's Motion to Certify for Immediate Appeal #283 does not provide grounds for continuing the stay of discovery as to Macy's. Accordingly, the Court hereby lifts the stay of discovery as to Macy's #165 #166 . Macy's is to serve its Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and related documents by 3/10/22 and Macy's is to serve its responses to Plaintiffs' written discovery requests by 3/24/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Information with Respect to the February 17, 2022 Joint Status Report by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of defendant Macy's, Inc.'s motion to certify for immediate appeal certain questions arising from the Court's January 27, 2022 order #283 set for 2/23/2022 at 9:30 AM will proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to status report #286 (Plaintiffs' Reply to the Clearview Defendants' "Response" to the February 17, 2022 Joint Status Report) (Drury, Scott)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Clarification of the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #270 , the Court provides the following clarification. With respect to Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 1, the Court's December 20, 2021 Order #237 compelled the Clearview Defendants to produce all documents and communications in their possession concerning any of the named Plaintiffs. The Court now accepts the Clearview Defendants' repeated representations to the Court that "the only way [for the Clearview Defendants] to conduct a reasonable search is by uploading a probe image and allowing Clearview's automated technology to compare the probe image's facial vectors with the facial vectors of the photographs in the database." (Defs.' Resp. at 5-6.) Accordingly, if Plaintiffs want the Clearview Defendants to search for and produce information pursuant to Plaintiffs' Request for Production No. 1, Plaintiffs are required to either (1) provide photographs of the named Plaintiffs to the Clearview Defendants, or (2) confirm whether photographs provided by the Clearview Defendants to Plaintiffs' counsel depict the named Plaintiffs. The Court notes that it has already held that Plaintiffs are obligated to produce photographs of themselves to the Clearview Defendants. Lastly, the Court finds that, under any reasonable reading of Section 25(a) of the Illinois Biometric Information Privacy Act, the Clearview Defendants would not violate the statute by running searches pursuant to this Court's discovery rulings. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 RESPONSE by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to status report #286 (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 2/18/2022. Emailed notice (yt)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Clearview Defendants' Renewed Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas #235 is granted, and the pending portion of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #213 is denied. Emailed notice (yt)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report of the Current Stay of Discovery for Macy's) by All Plaintiffs (Drury, Scott)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Reza Saeedi for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #283 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Saeedi, Daniel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM by Macy's, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #283 (Saeedi, Daniel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc.Certify for Immediate Appeal Certain Questions Arising from the Court's January 27, 2022 Order (Saeedi, Daniel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion to clarify #270 (Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Second Motion for Clarification of the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Drury, Scott)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #213 and in Support of Clearview Defendants' Motion to Quash #235 (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to other #263 (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) Objections to the December 20, 2021 Discovery Order on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and for Protective Order) (Drury, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/14/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court grants in part and denies in part defendants' motion to dismiss #87 . Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. An in-person status hearing is set for 3/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to clarify the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #270 / Clearview Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Clarification of the Court's December 20, 2021 Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery as to Macy's, Inc. #275 is stricken without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 37.2 and this Court's standing order. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the topics raised in Plaintiffs' motion and are strongly encouraged to resolve any disputes so as to obviate the need for Court intervention. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery as to Macy's, Inc.) (Drury, Scott)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(Kurtzberg, Joel)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 RESPONSE by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to other #263 / Clearview Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections to the December 20, 2021 Discovery Order on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and for Protective Order (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants in part and denies in part defendant's motion to dismiss #111 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/27/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Clarification of the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #270 is due by 2/10/22 and Plaintiffs' reply is due by 2/17/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to clarify the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorneys Amber L. Eck and Ian Pike's motion for leave to withdraw appearance #268 is granted. Attorneys Amber L. Eck and Ian Pike terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION by Attorney Amber L. Eck and Ian Pike to withdraw as attorney for Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene. No party information provided (Eck, Amber)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 REPLY by County of Alameda to MOTION by Defendant County of Alameda to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 #248 (Wenzel, Michael)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPLY by City of Antioch to MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 #249 (Lowry, Ethanluke)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Motion Regarding Fact Discovery Deadline #264 . Therein, the parties move jointly for an extension of the current fact discovery deadline, but propose different discovery schedules. After considering the parties' respective positions and the circumstances of the case, the Court extends the deadline for the completion of fact discovery to 5/26/22. The parties are to file a joint status report on discovery by 2/28/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Regarding Fact Discovery Deadline (Joint Motion) (Drury, Scott)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) Objections to the December 20, 2021 Discovery Order on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs (Drury, Scott)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to response in opposition to motion, #251 / The Clearview Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE by Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojasin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 #249 , MOTION by Defendant County of Alameda to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 #248 , MOTION by Defendant CITY OF EL SGUNDO to strike reply, #242 #250 (Leonida, Ellen)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Lee S. Wolosky's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #259 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19057229. (Wolosky, Lee)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Kevin L. Herrera's motion to withdraw as attorney of record #257 is granted. Attorney Kevin Lee Herrera terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION by Attorney Kevin L. Herrera to withdraw as attorney for Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas. No party information provided (Herrera, Kevin)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas by Sheila A Bedi (Bedi, Sheila)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aimee Albrecht, All Plaintiffs, Rosemary Arias, Ryan Balfanz, Maria Broccolino, Mario Calderon, Isela Carmean, Maryann Daker, Anthony Hall, Aaron Hurvitz, Aaron Hurvitz, Benjamin Jais, Dean John, Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Chris Marron, Mijente Support Committee, David Mutnick, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Shelby Zelonis Roberson, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas, Steven Vance, Andrea Vestrand by Sheila A Bedi (Bedi, Sheila)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #252 is granted in the sense that the Court provides the following clarification. Per Plaintiffs' specific question, the Court finds that, with respect to Request for Production Nos. 2, 3, 6, and 41, Plaintiffs are required to serve new requests rather than modifying the existing requests. Mailed notice (lp, )
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants County of Alameda, City of Antioch, and City of El Segundo's motions to strike #248 , #249 , #250 are taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to clarify the Court's December 20, 2021 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Drury, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to quash Nonparty Subpoenas (Renewed) #235 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Drury, Scott)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION by Defendant CITY OF EL SGUNDO to strike reply, #242 (Jones, Caylin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 (Lowry, Ethanluke)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION by Defendant County of Alameda to strike reply, #242 Pursuant to Local Rule 78.3 (Wenzel, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to file any objections pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 72(a) #246 is granted. Objections to be filed on or before 1/17/2022. As a reminder, pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(b) counsel should file a notice of motion when filing motions. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for extension of time to File Any Objections Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) (Drury, Scott)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to withdraw appearance of Andrew Miller #244 is granted. Attorney Andrew Clark Miller terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to withdraw appearance of Andrew Miller (Drury, Scott)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 REPLY by Plaintiffs Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas to memorandum in opposition to motion #223 , motion to remand #192 (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Omnibus Reply in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Notice of Filing of Request for Oral Argument)(Leonida, Ellen)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STATEMENT by Defendant County of Alamedain Support of MOTION by Defendant County of Alameda to remand #210 (Wenzel, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Errata by City of Antioch Re Defendant City of Antioch's Statement of No Opposition Filed to Motion for Judicial Determination of Fraudulent Joinder (Lowry, Ethanluke)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STATEMENT by Defendant City of Antiochin Support of MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch to remand #211 (Lowry, Ethanluke)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 12/21/2021. Counsel for defendant Clearview clarified to the Court that Clearview has no intention of contracting with non-government entities and if Clearview changes their mind, counsel will notify the Court. The parties are currently briefing a renewed motion to quash. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court will take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' response to the Clearview Defendants' Renewed Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas #235 is due by 1/11/22 and Defendants' reply is due by 1/18/22. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 12/20/2021: Mailed notice (lp, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #213 is granted in part and denied in part and Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order With Respect to Defendants' Written Discovery Requests #215 is granted in part and denied in part. Mailed notice (lp, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to quash Nonparty Subpoenas (Renewed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Sejal R. Zota's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #233 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18978590. (Zota, Sejal)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Amy Senia's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #229 is granted. Plaintiffs Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais' motion for leave to exceed Local Rule 7.1 page limit for its omnibus reply brief in support of plaintiffs' motion to remand #230 is granted. No appearance necessary on 12/20/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Ellen Valentik Leonida for presentment of motion for leave to file #230 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/20/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Leonida, Ellen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION by Plaintiffs Lisa Knox, Reyna Maldonado, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund, Steven Renderos, Suarez Rojas, Valeria Thais for leave to file a Document Exceeding Local Rule 7.1 Page Limit for its Omnibus Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Leonida, Ellen) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/16/2021) (jg, ).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18973976. (Senia, Amy)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais, Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa Knox, Mijente Support Committee, Norcal Resist Fund by Pratik K. Raj Ghosh (Raj Ghosh, Pratik)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 12/20/2021 is stricken and reset to 12/21/2021 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing is set for 12/20/2021 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion to compel,, #213 (Drury, Scott)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion for protective order, #215 (Drury, Scott)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc. in Opposition to motion to remand #192 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiffs Sean Burke, James Pomerene, and John McPherson dismiss without prejudice all their claims against Defendants with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene (Guglielmo, Joseph)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in Opposition to motion for protective order, #215 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in Opposition to motion to compel,, #213 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE by County of Alamedain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Renderos to remand #192 (Wenzel, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE by City of Antiochin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Renderos to remand #192 (Lowry, Ethanluke)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order With Respect to Defendants' Written Discovery Requests #215 is due by 12/3/21 and Plaintiffs' reply is due by 12/10/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for protective order with Respect to Defendants' Written Discovery Requests (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Drury, Scott)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery #213 is due by 12/3/21 and Plaintiffs' reply is due by 12/10/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel the Clearview Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Drury, Scott)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant City of Antioch's motion for extension of time to designate retention of local counsel #208 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch to remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan M. Lowry, #2 Exhibit 1 - Clearview's Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2019 CA Assembly Bill 1215, #4 Exhibit 3 - City of Alameda Resolution 15625)(Lowry, Ethanluke)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION by Defendant County of Alameda to remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael C. Wenzel, #2 Exhibit 1 - Clearview's Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2019 CA Assembly Bill 1215, #4 Exhibit 3 - City of Alameda Resolution 15625)(Wenzel, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MOTION by Defendant City of El Segundo to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rothans, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION by Defendant City of Antioch for extension of time TO DESIGNATE RETENTION OF LOCAL COUNSEL (Lowry, Ethanluke)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 27, 2021 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 41984. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874.
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Caylin W. Jones' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #205 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18820616. (Jones, Caylin)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The deadline to file replies to the motions to remand is 12/29/2021, not 12/19/2021 as stated in minute entry #202 . Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Steven J. Rothans' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #201 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/27/2021 by video. Defendant County of Alameda will file a motion to remand by 11/10/2021. Responses to both County of Alameda's motion to remand and to plaintiffs Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa Knox, Mijente Support Committee, and Norcal Resist Fund's motion to remand #192 by 12/10/2021; replies to both motions to remand to be filed by 12/19/2021. Once the motions are fully briefed, the Court shall take them under advisement. The Court will extend the time for defendants County of Alameda, City of Antioch, City of Alameda, and City of El Segundo to file responsive pleadings until after the ruling on the motions to remand. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18813911. (Rothans, Steven)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF ALAMEDA, CITY OF ANTIOCH, CITY OF ALAMEDA AND CITY OF EL SEGUNDO'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Lowry, Ethanluke)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorneys Michael C. Wenzel and Ethan M. Lowry's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #197 , #198 are granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18807079. for COUNTY OF ALAMEDA (Wenzel, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18807053. for CITY OF ANTIOCH (Lowry, Ethanluke)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The presentment hearing set for 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone will now proceed by video via Microsoft Teams. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 1-872-703-5321, then enter 252 377 937#. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Counsel of record is to have a cell phone available in case any technical or connection issues occur during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of Plaintiffs Steven Renderos, Valeris Thais Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa Knox, Mijente Support Committee, and Norcal Resist Fund's motion to remand #192 set for 10/26/2021 is stricken and reset to 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Ellen Valentik Leonida for presentment of motion to remand #192 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/26/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Leonida, Ellen)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM by Steven Renderos in support of motion to remand #192 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen V. Leonida, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ellen V. Leonida, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ellen V. Leonida, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ellen V. Leonida, #5 Declaration of Lisa Knox, #6 Declaration of Reyna Maldonado)(Leonida, Ellen)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Renderos to remand (Leonida, Ellen)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Kevin Herrera's motion for leave to appear as local counsel #188 and attorneys Tracy O. Zinsou and Ellen V. Leonida's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #189 , #190 are all granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18777936. (Leonida, Ellen)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18777840. (Zinsou, Tracy)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Renderos for leave to appear as Local Counsel (Herrera, Kevin)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Clearview Defendants' Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas for Failure to Comply with Local Rule 37.2 #186 is granted. The Clearview Defendants' Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas #179 is stricken without prejudice. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the topics raised in the motion to quash as required by Local Rule 37.2. Mailed notice (lp, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to strike MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to quash nonparty subpoenas #179 for Failure to Comply with Local Rule 37.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Jennifer Rocio dismisses without prejudice all clains against Defendants and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring case to become part of MDL number 2967. (ph, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AMENDED AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 10/5/2021: Mailed notice (lp, )
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The Court is entering the Amended Agreed Confidentiality Order submitted by the parties. In light of the parties' agreement on the issue, the Clearview Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (lp, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Rocio Without Prejudice (Arisohn, Joshua)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' response to Clearview Defendants' Motion to Quash Nonparty Subpoenas #179 is due 10/13/21 and Defendants' reply is due 10/20/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to quash nonparty subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Appendix - Unpublished Cases)(Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule #177 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 is now due 10/1/21 and Defendants' reply is now due 10/8/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION by Plaintiff All PlaintiffsTO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule) (Drury, Scott)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule #175 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 is now due 9/24/21 and Defendants' reply is now due 10/1/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to Modify Briefing Schedule (AGREED) (Drury, Scott)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule #173 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 is now due 9/17/21 and Defendants' reply is now due 9/24/21. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to Modify Briefing Schedule (AGREED) (Drury, Scott)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That's motion for leave to withdraw appearance of attorney Lee Wolosky #171 is granted. Attorney Lee Scott Wolosky terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to withdraw appearance (Lichtman, Andrew)
September 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Authority, #2 Certificate of Service)(Abrams, Floyd)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: The parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule #168 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 is now due 9/10/21 and Defendants' reply is now due 9/17/21. The parties are again encouraged to continue to meet and confer in an effort to resolve the dispute without Court intervention. Mailed notice (lp, )
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule) (Drury, Scott)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by All Plaintiffs (Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Connection with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Clearview Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 8/31/2021: Mailed notice (lp, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.'s Motion for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 143] is granted and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to Provide Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Responses [Doc. No. 139] is denied. Mailed notice (lp, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to motion to dismiss #111 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saeedi, Daniel)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs are to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order #162 by 9/2/21 and Defendants are to file a reply by 9/9/21. The parties are encouraged to continue to meet and confer in an effort to resolve the dispute without Court intervention. Mailed notice (lp, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That/ Clearview Defendants' Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Appendix)(Wolosky, Lee)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's, Inc. by Blair Ann Harrington (Harrington, Blair)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Rachel L. Fried's motion for leave to withdraw appearance as counsel for Amicus Center on Privacy & Technology #159 is granted. Attorney Rachel Lauren Fried terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION by Attorney Rachel L. Fried to withdraw as attorney for Center on Privacy & Technology. No party information provided (Fried, Rachel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion to compel #139 (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Macy's Inc. to Provide Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Responses) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPLY by Macy's, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #155 , MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to stay Motion for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss #143 (Saeedi, Daniel)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court will set a deadline for any class certification motion after the Court has ruled on the pending motions to dismiss. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to stay Motion for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss #143 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Drury, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RESPONSE by Macy's, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel Defendant Macy's Inc. to Provide Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Respones #139 (Schaller, Rachel)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages, instanter #151 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to motion to dismiss #111 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Macy's, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss) (Drury, Scott)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file excess pages, instanter (UNOPPOSED) (Drury, Scott)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' unopposed motion to file excess pages #148 is granted. Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss #87 of not more than 20 pages. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #87 /Memorandum of Law In Further Support (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Cases)(Wolosky, Lee)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for leave to file excess pages /Unopposed Motion (Wolosky, Lee)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Defendant Macy's to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion to compel #139 on or before 8/12/21. Plaintiffs to file a reply on or before 8/19/21. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Magistrate Judge Valdez's referral is for discovery purposes. Plaintiffs filed a motion to compel Defendant Macy's, Inc. to provide Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and discovery responses #139 . Defendant Macy's, Inc. filed a motion to stay discovery pending resolution of its motion to dismiss #143 . Judge Valdez has entered a briefing schedule to address these matters #145 . The 8/2/2021 motion hearing is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs to file a response to defendant Macy's motion to stay discovery #143 on or before 8/12/21. Defendant to file a reply on or before 8/19/21. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice (lp, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Reza Saeedi for presentment of motion to stay #143 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/2/2021 at 10:30 AM. (Saeedi, Daniel)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to stay Motion for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss (Saeedi, Daniel)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM - Brief of Amici The First Amendment Clinic At Duke Law and Professors of Law Jane Bambauer and Eugene Volokh in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Morse, Rachel)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Amicus Parties Jane Bambauer, Duke Law First Amendment Clinic, Eugene Volokh's motion for leave to file brief of amici in support of defendant's motion to dismiss #138 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the amicus brief as a separate docket entry on the case docket. No appearance necessary on 7/29/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Sandel Morse for presentment of motion for leave to file, #138 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/29/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Morse, Rachel)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to compel Defendant Macy's Inc. to Provide Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Respones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Drury, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION by Amicus Parties Jane Bambauer, Duke Law First Amendment Clinic, Eugene Volokh for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici The First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law and Professors of Law Jane Bambauer and Eugene Volokh iso Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief of Amici The First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law and Professors of Law Jane Bambauer and Eugene Volokh iso Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Morse, Rachel)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/21/2021 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Order Number: 40868. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' agreed motion to modify briefing schedule on Macy's motion to dismiss #135 is granted. Plaintiffs to file a response to defendant Macy's motion to dismiss #111 on or before 8/6/2021. Defendant to file a reply on or before 8/27/2021. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Agreed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on Macy's Motion to Dismiss) (Drury, Scott)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #87 (Drury, Scott)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #87 by Electronic Frontier Foundation amicus brief in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss (Schwartz, Adam)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM by Center on Privacy & Technology in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Clearview Defendants' motion to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol. 1, #2 Appendix Vol. 2, #3 Appendix Vol. 3)(Fried, Rachel)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #87 (Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Center on Privacy & Technology's unopposed motion for leave to file amicus brief #119 , #120 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the amicus brief as a separate entry on the case docket. No appearance necessary on 7/13/2021. Electronic Frontier Foundation's unopposed motion to file brief of amicus #125 and American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois' unopposed motion for leave to file brief of amici curiae #128 are both granted. Counsel is to electronically file the briefs as separate docket entries on the case docket. No appearance necessary on 7/14/2021. Attorney Rachel L. Fried's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #118 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Kim Glenberg for presentment of motion for leave to file, #128 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/14/2021 at 08:45 AM. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION by Amicus Parties American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois for leave to file brief of amici curiae in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proposed brief of amici curiae))(Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois by Rebecca Kim Glenberg (Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Motion by Adam D. Schwartz for presentment of motion for leave to file #125 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/14/2021 at 08:45 AM. (Schwartz, Adam)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION by Amicus Electronic Frontier Foundation for leave to file amicus brief in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed amicus brief)(Schwartz, Adam)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Electronic Frontier Foundation by Adam D. Schwartz (Schwartz, Adam)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Center on Privacy & Technology by Craig Benson Futterman (Futterman, Craig)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 APPENDIX to Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Center on Privacy & Technology, 120-1 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol. 2, #2 Appendix Vol. 3)(Fried, Rachel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Lauren Fried for presentment of motion for leave to file #119 , motion to amend/correct, #120 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/13/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Fried, Rachel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION by Amicus Center on Privacy & Technology to amend/correct MOTION by Amicus Center on Privacy & Technology for leave to file Amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Clearview Defendants' motion to dismiss #119 Attaching Exhibit proposed amicus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amicus curiae brief)(Fried, Rachel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION by Amicus Center on Privacy & Technology for leave to file Amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Clearview Defendants' motion to dismiss (Fried, Rachel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18435893. (Fried, Rachel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: In light of the District Judge's denial of Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #105 , the status hearing previously set for 7/1/21 at 2:00 p.m. is stricken. Mailed notice (lp, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 First AMENDED complaint by All Plaintiffs against Clearview AI, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Drury, Scott)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' amended motion for leave to file first amended consolidated class action complaint #113 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry on the case docket. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Macy's, Inc.'s motion for leave to file its memorandum of law in support of its motion to dismiss in excess of 15 pages instanter #112 is granted. Plaintiffs to file a response to defendant Macy's, Inc.'s motion to dismiss the amended consolidated class action complaint #111 on or before 7/27/2021. Defendant to file a reply on or before 8/10/2021. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file (Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. for leave to file its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 15 Pages Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saeedi, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) (Saeedi, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file first amended consolidated class action complaint #109 is granted. Counsel is to electronically file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry on the case docket. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for leave to file First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Drury, Scott)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring case to become part of MDL 2967. (bg, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court grants the Clearview defendants' motion for clarification #106 . The operative complaint in this action is the April 9, 2021 Consolidated Class Action Complaint. The briefing schedule set on May 25, 2021 for the Clearview defendants' motion to dismissed filed on May 24, 2021 stands. The Clearview defendants have no obligation to respond to the amended complaint filed on May 25, 2021 in case number 20 C 512. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to clarify / Unopposed Motion for Clarification (Wolosky, Lee)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: The Court, in its discretion, denies the Illinois class plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #30 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/14/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court having received the notice from defendant Macy's, Inc. #102 , withdraws their motion to dismiss #56 . Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Correction regarding document #102 . (ym, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to withdraw prior responsive pleading motion to dismiss #56 (Saeedi, Daniel) (Docket Text Modified on 6/9/2021 by Clerk's Office.) (ym, ).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Mutnick as to Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Mutnick as to Thomas Mulcaire on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Mutnick as to Macy's, Inc. on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Drury, Scott)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the Court entered the parties' joint stipulation regarding temporary injunctive relief, the Court denies plaintiffs' motion to convert their motion for a preliminary injumction into a temporary restraining order motion as moot #69 . Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding the Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Convert Their Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction into a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/4/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Isela Carmean by Michael William Drew (Drew, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #69 (Joint Stipulation Regarding the Relief Requested in Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Convert Their Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction into a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction) (Drury, Scott)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Macy's, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC. (cp, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Settlement conference held. Parties reach terms of settlement regarding a stipulation in lieu of Plaintiffs' request for a TRO. Parties to jointly file the stipulation. A WebEx status hearing will be held on July 1, 2021 at 2:00PM before Judge Valdez. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Karen Newirth's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #92 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18288271. (Newirth, Karen)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Vance by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED complaint by Consolidated Mutnick Plaintiffs against Clearview AI, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Consolidated Class Action Complaint - No. 20-cv-512) (Drury, Scott)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs to file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss #87 on or before 7/9/2021. Defendants to file a reply on or before 7/30/2021. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #87 (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Unpublished Cases)(Wolosky, Lee)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That /Clearview Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Wolosky, Lee)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aaron Hurvitz, David Mutnick, Andrea Vestrand by Megan Colleen Pierce (Pierce, Megan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aaron Hurvitz, Andrea Vestrand by Andrew Clark Miller (Miller, Andrew)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aaron Hurvitz, Andrea Vestrand by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Remote settlement conference is set for 5/26/21 at 2:00 p.m. The Webex invitations will be sent to the parties by email prior to the conference. By 5/25/21 at 3:00 p.m., the parties are to submit to the chambers email address (Proposed_Order_Valdez@ilnd.uscourts.gov) brief settlement positions regarding the proposed stipulation addressing Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order referenced in the parties' status reports (Doc. Nos. #81 , #82 ). Mailed notice (lp, )
May 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Status Report by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
May 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STATUS Report by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wolosky, Lee)
May 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Plaintiffs' Notice of Clarification of Relief Sought in Connection with Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs (Drury, Scott)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file stipulated notice of supplemental information under seal #76 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Video motion hearing held on 5/21/2021. Oral motion by plaintiffs for leave to file amended complaint by 5/25/2021 is granted. Counsel is to file the amended complaint on the lead case docket, 21-cv-00135, and designate to which case it applies to in their pleading. Defendant Macy's, Inc. has until 6/8/2021 to let the Court know if they will move forward with their motion to dismiss #56 or if it will be withdrawn. Oral arguments held as to plaintiffs' emergency motion to convert their pending motion for preliminary injunction into a motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #69 . The matter is taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs (Stipulated Notice of Supplemental Information) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to seal (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Stipulated Notice of Supplemental Information Under Seal) (Drury, Scott)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion for miscellaneous relief #69 , in Support of Emergency Motion to Convert Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction into Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Drury, Scott)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of defendant Macy's Inc.'s motion to dismiss #56 set for 5/21/2021 at 9:15 AM is converted to a video hearing. Presentment of plaintiffs' emergency motion to convert their pending motion for preliminary injunction into a motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction set for 5/21/2021 at 9:15 AM is reset to 9:30 AM (NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY) and will also proceed by video conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 1-872-703-5321, then enter 864 397 964#. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Counsel of record is to have a cell phone available in case any technical or connection issues occur during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Status hearing set for 5/27/2021 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of defendant Macy's, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #56 and plaintiffs' emergency motion to convert their pending motion for preliminary into a motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #69 set for 5/21/2021 at 9:15 AM will proceed by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-Thatin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Convert Their Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction Into a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #69 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Mulcaire, #2 Exhibit A - Deposition Excerpt)(Kurtzberg, Joel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Robert Drury for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #69 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/21/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Drury, Scott)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file reply in support of motion for preliminary injunction under seal #66 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Convert Their Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction Into a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Drury, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (under seal), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (under seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (under seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (under seal), #6 Exhibit 6)(Drury, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SEALED REPLY by All Plaintiffs to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for preliminary injunction #30 (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Drury, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to seal document (Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Seal) (Drury, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Andrew Clark Miller (Miller, Andrew)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney David P. Saunders' motion for leave to withdraw appearance #63 is granted. Attorney David P. Saunders terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION by Attorney David P. Saunders to withdraw as attorney for Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. No party information provided (Lichtman, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/13/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' agreed joint motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #54 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's, Inc. by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's, Inc. by Andrew Sean Murphy (Murphy, Andrew)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Reza Saeedi for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #56 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/21/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Saeedi, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM by Macy's, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #56 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Saeedi, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION by Defendant Macy's, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction under F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) and 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Saeedi, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Macy's, Inc. by Daniel Reza Saeedi (Saeedi, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for protective order (Agreed Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order) (Drury, Scott)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC and Thomas Mulcaire's joint stipulation to extend time to answer ot otherwise respond to the consolidated class action complaint #52 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed on or before 5/24/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Certain Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (Abrams, Floyd)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 5/6/2021: Mailed notice (lp, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery in Connection with Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction #44 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Clearview Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery #47 is accordingly denied as moot. Mailed notice (lp, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That by Precious S. Jacobs-Perry (Amended) (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants David Andalcio, Clearview AI, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Jose Flores, Macy's, Inc., Thomas Mulcaire, Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC, Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That, Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC by Precious S. Jacobs-Perry (Jacobs-Perry, Precious)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for leave to file Sur-reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolosky, Lee)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs to motion for miscellaneous relief, #44 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery (Drury, Scott)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-Thatin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for Expedited Discovery in Connection with Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction #44 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee Wolosky, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wolosky, Lee)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for Expedited Discovery in Connection with Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott R. Drury, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration)(Drury, Scott)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Mulcaire, #2 Exhibit A to Mulcaire Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Mulcaire Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Mulcaire Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Mulcaire Declaration, #6 Affidavit of Kevin Metcalf, #7 Affidavit of Jason Webb, #8 Affidavit of Michael Williams, #9 Appendix of Unpublished Cases)(Wolosky, Lee)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the parties have been working diligently on agreeing to certain terms related to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #30 , and the Court was ready to rule on plaintiffs' initial motion for preliminary injunction before defendants filed their motion to centralize under 28 U.S.C. 1407 in August 2020, the Court, in its discretion, denies Professor Volokh's, Professor Bambauer's, and the First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law's motion to for leave to file an amicus curiae brief at this point in the litigation #39 . Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' agreed motion to file excess pages #37 is granted. Defendants are to file their opposition brief of not more than 20 pages. Plaintiffs are also given leave to file their reply brief of not more than 20 pages. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Sandel Morse for presentment of motion for leave to file, #39 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/4/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Morse, Rachel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION by Amicus Parties Jane Bambauer, Duke Law First Amendment Clinic, Eugene Volokh for leave to file - Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici First Amendment Clinic at Duke Law and Professors of Law Eugene Volokh and Jane Bambauer in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morse, Rachel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties Duke Law First Amendment Clinic, Eugene Volokh, Jane Bambauer by Rachel Sandel Morse (Morse, Rachel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for leave to file excess pages / Agreed Motion to File Excess Pages (Wolosky, Lee)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Vacating Conditional Transfer Order re MDL 2967: Renderos, et al. v. Clearview AI, Inc., et al. / N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:21-02567 (bg, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to Macy's, Inc. on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Drury, Scott)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Drury, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to Macy's, Inc. on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Drury, Scott)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC (as, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Macy's, Inc. (crl, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thomas Mulcaire (crl, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 4/9/2021. Oral motion by defendants for a 2-week extension to the briefing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is granted in part. Response to be filed by 4/30/2021, reply by 5/7/2021. Status hearing is set for 5/27/2021 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Drury, Scott)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs for preliminary injunction (Drury, Scott)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 COMPLAINT (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) filed by All Plaintiffs; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402.(Drury, Scott)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' Consolidated/Representative Complaint is due on or before 4/9/2021. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead by 5/24/2021. Rule 26 disclosures are due on or before 5/7/2021. Joinder of additional parties by no later than 10/1/2021. Fact discovery deadline 1/26/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint Proposed Case Management and Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs and Defendants (Drury, Scott)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing held on 3/12/2021. Parties are set to file a joint status report by 3/22/2021. The Court directs plaintiffs to file a revised motion for preliminary injunction no later than 4/9/2021. Defendants to file a response by 4/23/2021. The Court encourages both sides to work on an agreed preliminary injunction order. Telephone status hearing is set for 4/9/2021 at 10:30 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court appoints Scott R. Drury of Loevy & Loevy as interim lead counsel under Rule 23(g). Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/10/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Loevy & Loevy's motion for leave to file sur-response to Joseph P. Guglielmo's application for appointment as interim lead counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) #22 is denied. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene to motion for leave to file #22 Sur-Response (Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff David Mutnick for leave to file Sur-Response to Joseph P. Guglielmo's Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Drury, Scott)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Mutnick to other #9 (Loevy & Loevy's Objections to Application of Joseph P. Guglielmo's Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Drury, Scott)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene to other #9 in Support of the Application of Joseph P. Guglielmo for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel (Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio in Support of Scott R. Drury's Application for Lead Counsel (Arisohn, Joshua)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Aimee Albrecht, Rosemary Arias, Ryan Balfanz, Benjamin Jais, Dean John to other #9 in Support of Application of Joseph P. Guglielmo for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel (Keller, Amy)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shelby Zelonis Roberson in Support of Scott R. Drury's Application for Lead Counsel (Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Maria Broccolino In Support of Application of Joseph P. Guglielmo for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel (Grant, Lynda)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Maryann Daker, Chris Marron in Support of Joseph P. Guglielmo's Application for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel (Lynch, Gary)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response in Support of Joseph P. Guglielmo for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene (Eck, Amber)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Scott R. Drury's Application for Lead Counsel (Lynch, Gary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support of Scott R. Drury's Application for Lead Counsel by Anthony Hall (Drew, Michael)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Nomination of Scott R. Drury as Lead Counsel by Mario Calderon, Jennifer Rocio (Arisohn, Joshua)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Application of Scott R. Drury for Appointment as Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by David Mutnick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Scott R. Drury), #2 Exhibit 2 (Loevy & Loevy Firm Resume))(Drury, Scott)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application of Joseph P. Guglielmo for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by Sean Burke, John McPherson, James Pomerene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scott+Scott Firm Overview)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This case has been referred to Judge Valdez for discovery supervision. The parties are to file an agreed discovery schedule within ten days of the appointment of lead counsel for Plaintiffs. Mailed notice (lp, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Maria Valdez for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Video status hearing held on 2/9/2021. There has been no agreement as to lead counsel for plaintiffs. Applications for lead counsel are to be filed by 2/23/2021 and are to be no more than 5 pages. Any responses to the applications are to be filed by 3/2/2021 and are to be no more than 3 pages. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. Attorney Floyd Abrams is designated lead counsel for the two individual defendants, Hoan Ton-That and Richard Schwartz and attorney Lee Wolosky is the designated counsel for the Clearview AI, Inc. defendant. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Valdez for discovery supervision. Telephone status hearing is set for 3/12/2021 at 10:30 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS Report (Joint) by David Mutnick (Drury, Scott)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendants' joint motion to stay the case #3 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/26/2021 is stricken and reset to 2/9/2021 at 10:30 AM via Microsoft Teams. One attorney from each party will have access to the MS Teams platform, while the remainder may call in at 1-872-703-5321, then enter 697237068#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to the hearing by using the same number and access code. If the parties have agreed to lead counsel for the respective sides, the parties must inform the Court prior to the 2/9/2021 status. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Counsel of record is to have a cell phone available in case any technical or connection issues occur during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to stay / Joint Motion to Stay Case Until February 5, 2021 (Wolosky, Lee)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing is set for 1/26/2021 at 11:00 a.m. via Microsoft Teams. One attorney from each party will have access to the MS Teams platform, while the remainder may call in at 1-872-703-5321, then enter 697237068#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to the hearing by using the same number and access code. If the parties have agreed to lead counsel for the respective sides, the parties must inform the Court prior to the 1/26/2021 status. Otherwise, the Court will discuss lead counsel and the parties' first status report at the 1/26/2021 status hearing. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Counsel of record is to have a cell phone available in case any technical or connection issues occur during the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 TRANSFER Order of 12/15/20 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2967. Case No. 1:21-cv-135 master docket. (nsf, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/14/2021) (td, ). Modified on 1/14/2021 (td, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Clearview AI, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Arias
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Marron
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Daker
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Balfanz
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Jais
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rocio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hall
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Zelonis Roberson
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Albrecht
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mutnick
Represented By: Andrew Clark Miller
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Broccolino
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pomerene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Calderon
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean John
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hurvitz
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Andrew Clark Miller
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Represented By: Scott Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Vestrand
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Andrew Clark Miller
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Mutnick Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vance
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isela Carmean
Represented By: Michael William Drew
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Renderos
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyna Maldonado
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Knox
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mijente Support Committee
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norcal Resist Fund
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Pratik K. Raj Ghosh
Represented By: Sejal Zota
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynndalco Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Precious S. Jacobs-Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Precious S. Jacobs-Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Andalcio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D. Rozbruch
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Precious S. Jacobs-Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Data Analytics LLC
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Precious S. Jacobs-Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mulcaire
Represented By: Lee Scott Wolosky
Represented By: Precious S. Jacobs-Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Reza Saeedi
Represented By: Andrew Sean Murphy
Represented By: Blair Ann Harrington
Represented By: Paul John Yovanic, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel L Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Represented By: Ethanluke M Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Michael C. Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF EL SGUNDO
Represented By: Caylin w. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of El Segundo
Represented By: Caylin w. Jones
Represented By: Steven Joseph Rothans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Clearview AI, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Duke Law First Amendment Clinic
Represented By: Rachel Sandel Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professor Eugene Volokh
Represented By: Rachel Sandel Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professor Jane Bambauer
Represented By: Rachel Sandel Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center on Privacy & Technology
Represented By: Craig Benson Futterman
Represented By: Rachel Lauren Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Adam D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Glenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Glenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?