Continental Paper Grading Co. v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation - Amtrak
Plaintiff: Continental Paper Grading Co.
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation - Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2021cv00224
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Continental Paper Grading Co. by John F Stoviak (Stoviak, John)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney John F. Stoviak's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17852118. (Stoviak, John)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Continental Paper Grading Co. by Cathleen M. Devlin (Devlin, Cathleen)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Cathleen M. Devlin's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17839786. (Devlin, Cathleen)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gekas, John)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Continental Paper Grading Co.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17828527. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gekas, John)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Paper Grading Co. v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation - Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation - Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Paper Grading Co.
Represented By: John C. Gekas
Represented By: Cathleen M. Devlin
Represented By: John F Stoviak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?