Singleton Jr. et al v. B.L. Downey Company LLC
Plaintiff: Elmer Singleton Jr. and Theodore Davis
Defendant: B.L. Downey Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00236
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY by Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. to motion to stay #15 Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings (Mitchell, Catherine)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by B.L. Downey Company LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. to stay Proceedings #15 (Wissa, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for reassignment and consolidation #17 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 21 C 246 pending before Judge Kennelly be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC to consolidate cases Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wissa, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendant's response to the motion to stay #15 is due by 2/10/2021. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 2/17/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. to stay Proceedings (Mitchell, Catherine)
January 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC by Derek Grady Barella Schiff Hardin, LLP (Barella, Derek)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by B.L. Downey Company LLC (Wissa, Michael)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MEMORANDUM by B.L. Downey Company LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wissa, Michael)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Wissa, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Theodore Davis, Elmer Singleton Jr. by Catherine T Mitchell (Mitchell, Catherine)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC by Paula Marie Ketcham (Ketcham, Paula)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 3/26/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant B.L. Downey Company LLC by Michael Philip Wissa (Wissa, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wissa, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2020CH07172) filed by B.L. Downey Company LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17830842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wissa, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton Jr. et al v. B.L. Downey Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Singleton Jr.
Represented By: Catherine T Mitchell
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Davis
Represented By: Catherine T Mitchell
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.L. Downey Company LLC
Represented By: Paula Marie Ketcham
Represented By: Michael Philip Wissa
Represented By: Derek Grady Barella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?