Prokop et al v. Hileman et al
Plaintiff: Wayne A. Coglianese and Victoria Prokop
Defendant: John Borgens, City of Hometown, FNU Kosmowski, FNU LIS, Brandon Hileman, City of Summit, Marcin Stafira, Louis Dominguez, Jr, FNU Sullivan, Lis, Casey, Louis Dominguez, Sullivan and Kosmowski
Case Number: 1:2021cv00450
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Dckt. No. #18 ) is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by April 9, 2021. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Borgens, Casey, City of Hometown, Louis Dominguez, Brandon Hileman, Lis, Marcin Stafira, Sullivan by Lisa Marie McElroy (McElroy, Lisa)
March 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants John Borgens, Casey, City of Hometown, Louis Dominguez, Brandon Hileman, Lis, Marcin Stafira, Sullivan for extension of time to file answer DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Gainer, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Borgens, Casey, City of Hometown, Louis Dominguez, Brandon Hileman, Lis, Marcin Stafira, Sullivan by Zachary Adam Pestine (Pestine, Zachary)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants John Borgens, Casey, City of Hometown, Louis Dominguez, Brandon Hileman, Lis, Marcin Stafira, Sullivan by Brian Patrick Gainer (Gainer, Brian)
March 10, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Casey, Lis, Sullivan (txl, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop regarding Summons and Complaint served on Village of Summit on 2/10/2021 (Richards, Stephen)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop regarding Summons and Complaint served on City of Hometown on 2/10/2021 (Richards, Stephen)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wayne A. Coglianese regarding Summons and Complaint served on Brandon Hileman on 2/10/2021 (Richards, Stephen)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wayne A. Coglianese regarding Summons and Complaint served on Marcin Stafira on 2/10/2021 (Richards, Stephen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion to strike (Dckt. No. #10 ) is hereby granted. The previously filed requests for waiver of service (Dckt. No. #5 - #9 ) contained errors, and thus are stricken. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 8, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants John Borgens, City of Hometown, City of Summit, Louis Dominguez, Brandon Hileman, Marcin Stafira (mxo, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop to strike request for waiver of service #9 , request for waiver of service #8 , request for waiver of service #5 , request for waiver of service #7 , request for waiver of service #6 (Richards, Stephen)
January 30, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Marcin Stafira on 1/30/2021 by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop. Waiver of service due by 4/1/2021. (Richards, Stephen)
January 30, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Brandon Hileman on 1/30/2021 by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop. Waiver of service due by 4/1/2021. (Richards, Stephen)
January 30, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Luis Dominguez on 1/30/2021 by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop. Waiver of service due by 4/1/2021. (Richards, Stephen)
January 30, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to John Borgens on 1/30/2021 by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop. Waiver of service due by 4/1/2021. (Richards, Stephen)
January 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to City of Hometown on 1/30/2021 by Plaintiff Victoria Prokop. Waiver of service due by 4/1/2021. (Richards, Stephen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Prokop by Stephen L. Richards (Richards, Stephen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by April 14, 2021. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wayne A. Coglianese, Victoria Prokop by Joshua Samuel Milder Richards (Richards, Joshua)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Victoria Prokop; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17876943. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prokop et al v. Hileman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Borgens
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hometown
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hileman
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Summit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Stafira
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dominguez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lis
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dominguez
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan
Represented By: Brian Patrick Gainer
Represented By: Zachary Adam Pestine
Represented By: Lisa Marie McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kosmowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A. Coglianese
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Milder Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Prokop
Represented By: Stephen L. Richards
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Milder Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?