Walton v. People of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Willie James Walton
Defendant: United Nation Headquarter, Prizker, Cook County Department of Correction, Michael Halpert, People of Illinois, Timothy Evan, Amy P Campaneili, Skokie Courthouse, Tom Dart, Chicago Police Department and Ursula Walowski
Case Number: 1:2021cv00544
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 MAIL RETURNED, for document #9 sent to Willie James Walton returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to P.O. Box 999 Pinckneyville, IL 62274 (mxo, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On February 2, 2021, the Court dismissed this case, having determined that it was opened in error because Plaintiff included the case numbers for two previous cases he filed with this Court (20 C 4413 and 20 C 7455) and he did not pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. On February 26, 2021, the Court entered an order striking Plaintiff's first proposed amended complaint #8 , explaining that Plaintiff may not evade the dismissal of his prior filed cases by filing the same claims in what amounts to a duplicative complaint in this case. Plaintiff has now submitted a second proposed amended complaint #10 and supporting statements #11 #12 #13 , again including the case numbers for the two prior cases he filed in this Court on both submissions. A review of the dockets of both prior filed cases reveals that they have been dismissed for failure to state a claim. In Case No. 20 C 4413, Judge Kendall has entered an order stating that Plaintiff is pursuing frivolous litigation and that he should no longer submit documents to the Court in that action, See Walton v. Chicago Police Department, et al., Case No. 20 C 4413 (N.D.Ill.) (Kendall, J.) (Dkt. 87). In Walton v. United Nations Headquarters, et al., Case No 20 C 7455 (N.D.Ill.) (Pallmeyer, J.) the case was dismissed on February 22, 2021, for failure to comply with court orders and failure to submit a properly completed and certified application to proceed in in forma pauperis. The second proposed amended complaint #10 is stricken. This case remains closed. Plaintiff should not submit any more documentation or pleadings in this case. In the future, if he does, the Clerk is instructed to return the materials to Plaintiff, unfiled. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/8/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT by Willie James Walton of in representation. (nsf, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT by Willie James Walton of tourture. (nsf, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT of the witness and robber by Willie James Walton. (nsf, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Willie James Walton (Envelope post marked 2/23/21) (nsf, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On February 2, 2021, the Court dismissed this case, having determined that it was opened in error because Plaintiff included the case numbers for two previous cases he filed with this Court (20 C 4413 and 20 C 7455) and he did not pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has now submitted an amended complaint #8 and a new motion for attorney assistance #7 , again including the case numbers for the two prior cases he filed in this Court on both submissions. A review of the dockets of both prior filed cases reveals that they have been dismissed for failure to state a claim. In Case No. 20 C 4413, Judge Kendall has entered an order stating that Plaintiff is pursuing frivolous litigation and that he should no longer submit documents to the Court in that action, See Walton v. Chicago Police Department, et al., Case No. 20 C 4413 (N.D.Ill.) (Kendall, J.) (Dkt. 87). In Walton v. United Nations Headquarters, et al., Case No 20 C 7455 (N.D.Ill.) (Pallmeyer, J.) the case was dismissed on February 22, 2021, for failure to comply with court orders and failure to submit a properly completed and certified application to proceed in in forma pauperis. The amended complaint submitted in this case was also docketed in Case No. 20 C 7455. This case remains closed. Plaintiff may not evade dismissal orders in the two prior cases by submitting an amended pleading in this case (as well as the others) that just happens to include the case number in this case. Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint #8 is stricken and his motion for attorney assistance #7 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/26/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Willie James Walton against Ursula Walowski. (Envelope postmarked 2/17/2021) (ph, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Willie James Walton for attorney assistance. (Envelope postmarked 2/17/2021) (ph, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's complaint and determined that this case was opened in error because Plaintiff included the case numbers for two previous cases he filed with this Court (20 C 4413 and 20 C 7455) and he did not pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the way Plaintiff labeled the complaint and the motion for attorney representation #3 it is clear that Plaintiff intended these filings not as a new case but as filings to be docketed in the other two previously filed cases. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close this case as having been opened in error and to file both the complaint #1 and the motion for attorney assistance in Case Nos. 20 C 4413 and 20 C 7455. This case is terminated on the Court's docket and the motion for attorney assistance is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/2/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMARY STATEMENT by Willie James Walton. (Envelope postmarked 1/26/2021) (ph, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Injustice by Willie James Walton. (Envelope postmarked 1/20/2021) (ph, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Willie James Walton for attorney representation. (ph, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Willie James Walton. (Envelope not postmarked) (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. People of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Nation Headquarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prizker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Halpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy P Campaneili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skokie Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Walowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?