Dolis v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: James Dolis
Defendant: Michael Cummings, Patrick M. Sheehan, City of Chicago, Cook County, Karen Murphy, Kevin M. Sheehan, Christine Nere, Elizabeth Kent, Marcelle Le Compte,, Mary M Brosnahan, James D Egan, Anthony Wronkowski, Cook County, Illinois and City of Chicago, Illionois
Case Number: 1:2021cv00550
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:bDefendant City of Chicago's agreed motion for an extension of time #9 is granted. The City's answer or other responsive pleading is now due 5/7/2021. bMailed notice (air, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago, Illionois for extension of time Def City of Chicago's Agreed MET to Respond to Pl Complt - First Request for Extension (Wallace, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, Illionois by Christopher A Wallace (Wallace, Christopher)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Marcelle Le Compte, by Joseph Anthony Hodal NOA on behalf of LeCompte and Cook County (Hodal, Joseph)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marcelle Le Compte, by Joseph Anthony Hodal Atty Appearance (Hodal, Joseph)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendants' motion to dismiss #4 is taken under advisement. The plaintiff's response is due 4/6; the defendants' reply is due 4/20. Mailed notice (air, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Marcelle Le Compte, (Brener, Edward)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Marcelle Le Compte, by Edward M. Brener (Brener, Edward)
February 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mary M Brosnahan, Kevin M. Sheehan (gw, )
February 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City of Chicago, Illionois, Cook County, Illinois (gw, ) Modified on 2/12/2021 (gw, ). Modified on 2/12/2021 (gw, ).
February 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants James D Egan, Patrick M. Sheehan (gw, )
February 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Michael Cummings, Elizabeth Kent, Marcelle Le Compte,, Karen Murphy, Christine Nere, Anthony Wronkowski (gw, )
February 1, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James Dolis by James J. Macchitelli (Macchitelli, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Dolis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17881192. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Macchitelli, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolis v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Nere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelle Le Compte,
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Hodal
Represented By: Edward M. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Wronkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Hodal
Represented By: Edward M. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, Illionois
Represented By: Christopher A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dolis
Represented By: James J. Macchitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?