Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan v. Maple Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan
Defendant: Maple Management, LLC and James Mecha
Case Number: 1:2021cv00646
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At Plaintiff's request #16 , this case is administratively closed without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking to re-open the case. The status hearing set for 3/26/2021 #14 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS Report by Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan (Berglund, Joseph)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER by Defendant James Mecha to third party citation. (nsf, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 3/15/2021 #11 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file the initial joint status report by 3/19/2021. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A. (Third Party) (No Notice). (mc, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan re notice of filing #11 Amended Release (Berglund, Joseph)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan Release of Citation Against First Midwest Bank (Berglund, Joseph)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Maple Management, LLC by Ariel Weissberg (Weissberg, Ariel)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Defendant Maple Management, LLC (Berglund, Joseph)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Greenwich Capital Managment- Third Party & Ravenswood Bank - Third Party (No Notice Filed). (mc, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Chicago Title Land Trust Co (Third Party). (mc, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Maple Management LLC d/b/a Rae Lifts (No Notice). (lma, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to James Mecha (No Notice). (lma, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to First Midwest Bank (No Notice)(Third Party). (rc, )
February 5, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan by Joseph Patrick Berglund (Berglund, Joseph)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment by Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan from US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Case Number 19CV04305; Judgment for Trustees of The National Elevator Industry Pension, Health Benefit, Educational, Elevator Industry Work Preservation Funds, Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan and against Maple Management LLC and James Mecha in the amount of $$222,619.58 entered on 12/15/2020. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-17895313. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berglund, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan v. Maple Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Management, LLC
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Elevator Industry Pension Plan, Health Benefit and Education Funds Elevator Constructors Annuity and 401(K) Retirement Plan
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?