Collado v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Plaintiff: David Collado
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc and Sprint Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00763
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED complaint by David Collado against T-Mobile USA Inc filed with written consent of Defendant pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2), adding Count 6 (ADA) (Herrera, Julie)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc by Jeffrey Scott Nowak (Nowak, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc by Jennifer Lynn Jones (Jones, Jennifer)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 4/14/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David Collado. T-Mobile USA Inc waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Herrera, Julie)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Molitor, Steven)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Collado by Steven James Molitor, Jr (Molitor, Steven)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Collado by Julie Herrera (Herrera, Julie)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Collado; jury demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17917059.(Herrera, Julie)
February 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collado v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Collado
Represented By: Steven James Molitor, Jr
Represented By: Julie Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?