Williams v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Terrence T Williams
Defendant: Jane Doe, Randy Slater, Jeannine Humphrey, Dave Adams, Brooks, John Doe, K Bettega, Michelle Moffett, Kim Young, Jerry Outlaw, Stuart Taylor, Rob, 2487, Santerelli, T Richards, James Quigley and Kuzma
Case Number: 1:2021cv00774
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Terrence T Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope not Postmarked) (jh, )
March 18, 2021 MAILED copy of order dated 3/16/21 #5 , blank IFP Application to plaintiff. (nsf, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Terrence T Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 3/16/2021: Plaintiff's motion for a courtesy copy of his complaint and an extension of time to submit an amended complaint #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has not submitted an in forma pauperis application in this case. By order of March 3, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to submit a properly completed IFP application or pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee by March 31, 2021 if he wanted to proceed with this case. The Court extends the deadline to do so to April 15, 2021. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order and a blank IFP application. Mailed notice (axc).
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Terrence T Williams for curteousy copie of complaint, MOTION by Plaintiff Terrence T Williams for extension of time to amend complaint.(Envelope post marked 3/8/21) (nsf, )
March 3, 2021 MAILED copy of order dated 3/3/21 (3) ifp application to plaintiff. (nsf, )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff initiated this lawsuit without pre-paying the $402.00 filing fee or submitting an in forma pauperis application.If Plaintiff wants to pursue this lawsuit, he must, by March 31, 2021 either (1) pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) seek leave to pay the filing fee in installments by submitting a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis(prisoner version), along with a copy of this order. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 until his filing-fee status is resolved. Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 3/3/2021.Mailed notice (nsf, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and zero copies by Terrence T. Williams. (Envelope not postmarked) (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannine Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Bettega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2487
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santerelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuzma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?