Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC v. Oakbrook Realty and Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC
Defendant: Donna Krilich and Oakbrook Realty and Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01039
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to First Nations Bank, re: Oakbrook Realty and Investments LLC., re: Donna Krilich.. (daj, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Shepard Schwartz & Harris, LLP. re: Oakbrook Realty & Investments, LLC. re: Donna Krilich. (daj, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to First Midwest bank, re: Oakbrook Realty & Investments, LLC., re: Donna Krilich. (daj, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to First Midwest bank, re: Oakbrook Realty & Investments, LLC., re: Donna Krilich. (daj, )
February 23, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gcy, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC by Blair R. Zanzig (Zanzig, Blair)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zanzig, Blair)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment by Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC from Northern District of Georgia, Case Number 16-CV-3817; Judgment for Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and against Oakbrook Realty and Investments LLC, and Donna Krilich in the amount of $1069397.51 entered on 11/02/2020. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-17958042. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zanzig, Blair)
February 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC v. Oakbrook Realty and Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Krilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakbrook Realty and Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC
Represented By: Blair R. Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?