Zhang et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: SAWYER ROBBINS (a minor), ALEXA ROBBINS (a minor), YONG CHEN ZHI, SOOPHIA JIANG, CORENE ROBBINS (a minor), JACQUELINE GEE, YOON KIL LEE (a minor), SALVADOR F. RIVAS, ANNE ROBBINS (a minor), IRENE ZHANG, HYUN SHIM KIM, FLETCHER ROBBINS (a minor), JOE YOUNG SUNG, ZHENG LIANG, CHOON YUL LEE, YAN DENG, POSE 1-100, NORA HELEN FERRUFINO, JANINA WU, YU QIAN GE, YUAN XIE, CATHERINE XIAOMEI LIU, RICKY GLASSMAN, YU DAN WANG, GUO QIANG DING, BILAN HEIF, LEI DONG, XINGWEN YE, VANESSA ROBBINS, LUCY GLASSMAN, ROBERT ROBBINS, MING WU, YUAN GAO, SOPHIA JIANG, XIN JIE LI, ZHONG PING GAO, CHARLES SHEN HAO, YOON KIL LEE, SZUTING CHEN and COOPER ROBBINS
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, DOES 1-50, The Boeing Company and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 1:2021cv01127
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Boeing Company (cl, )
April 11, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/21/2021. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/22/2021: Mailed notice (rc, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff YUAN GAO to appoint Guardian ad litem for E.S. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED complaint by BILAN HEIF, JANINA WU, Lei Dong, Irene Zhang, Guo Qiang Ding, YONG CHEN ZHI, Yan Deng, MING WU, SALVADOR F. RIVAS, YUAN XIE, Yu Qian Ge, CHOON YUL LEE, YU DAN WANG, Vanessa Robbins, ZHENG LIANG, LUCY GLASSMAN, Nora Helen Ferrufino, JOE YOUNG SUNG, XINGWEN YE, Catherine Xiaomei Liu, RICKY GLASSMAN, HYUN SHIM KIM, Robert Robbins, Jacqueline Gee, XIN JIE LI, SOPHIA JIANG, YUAN GAO, ZHONG PING GAO, SZUTING CHEN, YOON KIL LEE, COOPER ROBBINS, CHARLES SHEN HAO against All Defendants (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff MING WU to appoint Guardian ad litem for F.W. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff MING WU to appoint Guardian ad litem for J.W. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Robbins to appoint Guardian ad litem for A.R. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Robbins to appoint Guardian ad litem for F.R. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Robbins to appoint Guardian ad litem of S.R. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Robbins to appoint Guardian ad litem for C.R. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Robbins to appoint Guardian ad litem for A.R. (Andersen, Nicole)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17983030. (Andersen, Nicole)
February 26, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs YAN DENG, GUO QIANG DING, LEI DONG, NORA HELEN FERRUFINO, YU QIAN GE, JACQUELINE GEE, LUCY GLASSMAN, RICKY GLASSMAN, BILAN HEIF, SOOPHIA JIANG, HYUN SHIM KIM, CHOON YUL LEE, YOON KIL LEE (a minor), ZHENG LIANG, CATHERINE XIAOMEI LIU, POSE 1-100, SALVADOR F. RIVAS, ROBERT ROBBINS, VANESSA ROBBINS, ALEXA ROBBINS (a minor), ANNE ROBBINS (a minor), CORENE ROBBINS (a minor), FLETCHER ROBBINS (a minor), SAWYER ROBBINS (a minor), JOE YOUNG SUNG, YU DAN WANG, JANINA WU, MING WU, YUAN XIE, XINGWEN YE, IRENE ZHANG, YONG CHEN ZHI by Alexandra Marie Wisner (Wisner, Alexandra)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs YAN DENG, GUO QIANG DING, LEI DONG, NORA HELEN FERRUFINO, YU QIAN GE, JACQUELINE GEE, LUCY GLASSMAN, RICKY GLASSMAN, BILAN HEIF, SOOPHIA JIANG, HYUN SHIM KIM, CHOON YUL LEE, YOON KIL LEE (a minor), ZHENG LIANG, CATHERINE XIAOMEI LIU, POSE 1-100, SALVADOR F. RIVAS, ROBERT ROBBINS, VANESSA ROBBINS, ALEXA ROBBINS (a minor), ANNE ROBBINS (a minor), CORENE ROBBINS (a minor), FLETCHER ROBBINS (a minor), SAWYER ROBBINS (a minor), JOE YOUNG SUNG, YU DAN WANG, JANINA WU, MING WU, YUAN XIE, XINGWEN YE, IRENE ZHANG, YONG CHEN ZHI by Floyd A. Wisner (Wisner, Floyd)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IRENE ZHANG; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17969060. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wisner, Floyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAWYER ROBBINS (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXA ROBBINS (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YONG CHEN ZHI
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOOPHIA JIANG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORENE ROBBINS (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE GEE
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOON KIL LEE (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVADOR F. RIVAS
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE ROBBINS (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE ZHANG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYUN SHIM KIM
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLETCHER ROBBINS (a minor)
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE YOUNG SUNG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHENG LIANG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHOON YUL LEE
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAN DENG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POSE 1-100
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA HELEN FERRUFINO
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANINA WU
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YU QIAN GE
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUAN XIE
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE XIAOMEI LIU
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY GLASSMAN
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YU DAN WANG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUO QIANG DING
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILAN HEIF
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEI DONG
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XINGWEN YE
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA ROBBINS
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY GLASSMAN
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT ROBBINS
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MING WU
Represented By: Floyd A. Wisner
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Wisner
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUAN GAO
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOPHIA JIANG
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIN JIE LI
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHONG PING GAO
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES SHEN HAO
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOON KIL LEE
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SZUTING CHEN
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOPER ROBBINS
Represented By: Nicole Christiane Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?