Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. et al v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Plaintiff: La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDTC, LLC, PMDCA, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc., PMDLAB, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, Lone Star MTC, Inc., Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Bakorp, LLC, Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc. doing business as LYNNWOOD POST ACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc. doing business as RIVERBEND POST ACUTE REHABILITATION, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. doing business as GRANITE CREEK HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER and La Jolla Skilled, Inc. doing business as THE SPRINGS AT PACIFIC REGENT
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company and American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01150
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDLAB, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, Bakorp, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, La Jolla Skilled, Inc., New England Medical Transportation, Inc., Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, Lone Star MTC, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc.. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/18/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Crosner, Shaun)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Bakorp, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Lone Star MTC, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, PMDLAB, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. by Shaun H. Crosner (Crosner, Shaun)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Bakorp, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Lone Star MTC, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, PMDLAB, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. by Nicolas A. Pappas (Pappas, Nicolas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by attorneys Nicolas Pappas and Shaun Crosner #8 , #9 are granted. Counsel are directed to file their appearances on behalf of the plaintiff. Mailed notice (air, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17984783. (Crosner, Shaun)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17984699. (Pappas, Nicolas)
March 2, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company (gw, )
March 2, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Bakorp, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Lone Star MTC, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, PMDLAB, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. by Amie Marie Bauer (Bauer, Amie)
February 28, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDLAB, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, Bakorp, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, La Jolla Skilled, Inc., New England Medical Transportation, Inc., Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, Lone Star MTC, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc. against American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company and terminating Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Katherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (O'Brien, Katherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Bakorp, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Lone Star MTC, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, PMDLAB, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. by Amie Marie Bauer (Bauer, Amie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Bakorp, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc., La Jolla Skilled, Inc., Lone Star MTC, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, New England Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, PMDLAB, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. by Katherine M. O'Brien (O'Brien, Katherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Brien, Katherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc., PMDLAB, LLC, Big Blue Healthcare, Inc., Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC, Bakorp, LLC, PMDTC, LLC, La Jolla Skilled, Inc., New England Medical Transportation, Inc., Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc., Lynnwood Health Services, Inc., PMDCA, LLC, Lone Star MTC, Inc., Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17973344. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. et al v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Skilled, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavstar Medical Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMDTC, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMDCA, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMDLAB, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Medical Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medstar Medical Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star MTC, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Blue Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakorp, LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnwood Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthlift Medical Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnwood Health Services, Inc. doing business as LYNNWOOD POST ACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Blue Healthcare, Inc. doing business as RIVERBEND POST ACUTE REHABILITATION
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watson Woods Healthcare, Inc. doing business as GRANITE CREEK HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Skilled, Inc. doing business as THE SPRINGS AT PACIFIC REGENT
Represented By: Katherine M. O'Brien
Represented By: Nicolas A. Pappas
Represented By: Amie Marie Bauer
Represented By: Shaun H. Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?