United States of America v. Sundar
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kannan Sundar
Case Number: 1:2021cv01291
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Telephonic rule to show cause hearing held on 4/27/2021. Defendant Kannan Sundar present via telephone. Government's petition to enforce IRS summons #1 is granted and Defendant Sundar shall fully comply with each aspect of the IRS summons on or before 6/10/2021. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff United States of America regarding Order to Show Cause and Petition to Enforce Summons served on Kannan Sundar on March 30, 2021 (Kaufman, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/18/2021. Mailed notice(gel, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants the United States' petition to enforce Internal Revenue Service summons #1 . Enter Order to Show Cause. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Joseph M Kaufman (Kaufman, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kaufman, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to enforce IRS summons filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Joseph)
March 8, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kannan Sundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph M Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?