United States of America v. Scott
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Leannette Scott and Leannette Pickens
Case Number: 1:2021cv01499
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion to reset status hearing #7 is granted. The initial status hearing set for 5/7/2021 is stricken. Counsel for both sides are directed to email the Courtroom Deputy after Defendant has answered or otherwise responded to the complaint to schedule an initial status hearing. Emailed notice (cdh, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS Report by United States of America (Glen, Julia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to reset Status Hearing Scheduled for 5/7/21 (Glen, Julia)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 5/7/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Joint status report due by 5/4/2021. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Jordan Andrew Konig (Konig, Jordan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Leannette Scott (crl, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Julia Marie Glen (Glen, Julia)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glen, Julia)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Glen, Julia)
March 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leannette Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leannette Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julia Marie Glen
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?