Clay v. VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: SHARDA CLAY
3Rd Party Defendant: United States of America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01634
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Sharda Clay to continue Joint Motion for Continuance of Initial Status Conference and Report Submission (Poster, Myles)
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion to remand #16 is taken under advisement; response is due by 6/1/2021; reply is due by 6/15/2021. Notice of motion date of 5/4/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Sharda Clay in support of motion to remand, #16 for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint at Law, #3 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit Notice and Acknowledgement, #5 Exhibit Amended Case Management Order, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Unreported Case_McCarter v. John Hancock Center, #8 Exhibit Unreported Case_Colson Caster Corp. v. US)(Poster, Myles)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Sharda Clay to remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint at Law, #2 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal and Substitution)(Poster, Myles)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Myles Jacob Poster for presentment of before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/4/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Poster, Myles)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Initial telephone conference is set for 6/10/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Joint status report due by 6/7/2021. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18104217. (Norman, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharda Clay by Jerome A. Vinkler (Vinkler, Jerome)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharda Clay by Myles Jacob Poster (Poster, Myles)
April 3, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The United States' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to amended complaint #7 is granted to and including 6/1/2021. A joint status report is due no later than 6/8/2021. Motion to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Emailed notice (cdh, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for ThirdParty Plaintiff VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc., Defendant VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc. by Matthew W. Mcelligott (Mcelligott, Matthew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for ThirdParty Plaintiff VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc., Defendant VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc. by David Craig Hall (Hall, David)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Third Party Defendant United States of America for extension of time to file answer (United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint) (Hartzler, Alex)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for ThirdParty Plaintiff VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc., Defendant VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc. by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18059628. (Poster, Myles)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Third Party Defendant United States of America (Hartzler, Alex)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hartzler, Alex)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 L 013059) filed by United States of America (Hartzler, Alex)
March 25, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alex Harms Hartzler
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: VHS West Suburban Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: David Craig Hall
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Matthew W. Mcelligott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARDA CLAY
Represented By: Jerome A. Vinkler
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Norman
Represented By: Myles Jacob Poster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?