Wells v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Wells, Jr
Defendant: Stateville Corrections Center, David Gomez and D. Hunter
Case Number: 1:2021cv01688
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 MAILED order dated 5/18/2021 #7 , an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions to Alfonzo Wells, Jr. (jn, )
May 19, 2021 MAILED order dated 5/18/2021 #7 to Inmate trust account office at Hill Correctional Center. (jn, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's applications for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 #5 are granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to immediately deduct $11.20 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at the facility where Plaintiff is being held and to the Court's Fiscal Department. Summons, however, shall not issue. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. Failure to submit an amended complaint by June 22, 2021, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/18/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Alfonzo Wells, Jr of Change of Address. (Envelope postmark 5/8/2021). (jn, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Alfonzo Wells, Jr of Change of Address. (Envelope postmark 4/22/2021). (jn, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Alfonzo Wells, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 4/9/2021) (ph, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Alfonzo Wells, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 4/9/2021) (exr, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint #1 but did not prepay the filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. By May 10, 2021, Plaintiff must either: (1) submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes the documentation and certification described below; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $402.00. If he does not comply, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order and to add Plaintiff's inmate identification number to the docket. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/5/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
April 5, 2021 MAILED order #3 , and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to Alfonzo Wells Jr. (jn, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Alfonzo Wells, Jr (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 3/19/2021). (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Wells, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?