Vernon v. I.R.S. et al
Plaintiff: Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr.
Defendant: I.R.S.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01740
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: After screening pro se plaintiff Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr.'s complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court dismisses this lawsuit for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Therefore, plaintiff's motion to reopen the case is denied #11 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/5/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr to reopen case (mc, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case called for a telephone motion hearing as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 on 4/23/2021. Plaintiff did not appear nor contact the Court. The motions are stricken. Case is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 23, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ym, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case was called for presentment of plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 . Plaintiff did not appear on the line for the telephone hearing nor contacted the Court. Telephone motion hearing is continued to 4/23/2021 at 11:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. If plaintiff fails to call in for the hearing, the case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are set for 4/14/2021 at 10:15 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr for attorney representation. (lw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (lw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr. (lw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (lw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon v. I.R.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.R.S.
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Howard Vernon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?