Aronson et al v. JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Plaintiff: Matthew Aronson and Steven Aronson
Defendant: JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, JJMT Capital LLC, Tyler Crookston, Matthew Schweinzger, Joseph DeAlteris and Jacob Wunderlin
Case Number: 1:2021cv01867
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 58 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson against Tyler Crookston, Joseph DeAlteris, JJMT Capital LLC, Matthew Schweinzger, Jacob Wunderlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Certificate of Service)(Rubin, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file amended complaint to correct exhibit. #56 Plaintiffs are directed to file their second amended complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 12/10/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
December 2, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson for leave to file Second Amended Complaint to Correct Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part I, #2 Exhibit A-Part II)(Rubin, Daniel)
December 2, 2021 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. They plan to exchange initial disclosures and written discovery in the very near future, but have not otherwise begun discovery. The 4/29/22 fact discovery deadline remains set. The parties do not all agree that a settlement conference would be fruitful at this time. The parties are ordered to file an updated joint status report on 2/7/22. Mailed notice (gw, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 54 STATUS Report Joint by Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson (Rubin, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 53 REPLY by Defendant Tyler Crookston in support of his 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Levin, Jena)
November 3, 2021 Filing 52 RESPONSE by Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronsonin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tyler Crookston #46 (Rubin, Daniel)
November 2, 2021 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 15 Pages #50 . Plaintiffs' response shall be limited to 18 pages. Mailed notice (axc).
November 1, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Rubin, Daniel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson by Christopher Lee Schaeffer (Schaeffer, Christopher)
October 13, 2021 Filing 48 MINUTE Entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant Tyler Crookston's Motion to Dismiss #46 : Plaintiffs' response is due 11/03/2021 and Defendant's reply is due 11/17/2021. The Court will rule on this motion via CM/ECF. Mailed notice (axc).
October 12, 2021 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Tyler Crookston in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #46 (Wheeler, Ellen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tyler Crookston (Wheeler, Ellen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyler Crookston by Ellen M. Wheeler (Wheeler, Ellen)
October 12, 2021 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyler Crookston by Margaret Gembala Nelson (Nelson, Margaret)
October 12, 2021 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tyler Crookston by Jena Louise Levin (Levin, Jena)
September 29, 2021 Filing 42 REPLY by Defendants Joseph DeAlteris, JJMT Capital LLC, Matthew Schweinzger, Jacob Wunderlin in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (Ryan, Matthew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been referred to Judge Cox for settlement and discovery management. The Court sets a 4/29/22 fact discovery deadline. It is not the Court's practice to subdivide fact discovery or to set additional dates until it becomes clear the fact discovery deadline will be met. The parties are ordered to file an updated joint status report on 12/1/21 informing the Court of the progress of fact discovery and whether a settlement conference would be fruitful at that time. Mailed notice (np, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 40 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Susan E. Cox for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice.
September 10, 2021 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge Cox. The Court anticipates discovery will continue while any motions to dismiss are pending. If the parties request a stay of discovery, they are to bring that motion before the District Court Judge. Without a stay, it is expected that discovery will continue. Mailed notice (axc).
September 8, 2021 Filing 38 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson Table of Contents and Table of Cases regarding response to motion #37 (Rubin, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Joseph DeAlteris, JJMT Capital LLC, Matthew Schweinzger, Jacob Wunderlin #29 (Rubin, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 15 Pages #35 . Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be limited to 19 pages. Mailed notice (axc).
September 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson for leave to file excess pages (Rubin, Daniel)
August 13, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson. Tyler Crookston waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
August 13, 2021 Filing 33 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Tyler Crookston on August 11, 2021 by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson. Waiver of service due by 9/10/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Matthew Aronson (Rubin, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants the joint unopposed motion for leave to file oversized brief instanter #28 filed by Defendants JJMT Capital LLC, Jacob Wunderlin, Matthew Schweinzger, and Joseph Dealteris. The Court also grants Defendant JJMT Capital LLC's unopposed motion to extend time to answer paragraphs not subject to motion to dismiss #30 . The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the joint Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss filed by Defendants JJMT Capital LLC, Jacob Wunderlin, Matthew Schweinzger, and Joseph Dealteris #29 : Plaintiffs' response is due on or before 09/08/2021 and shall be limited to 18 pages; Defendants' reply is due on or before 09/29/2021 and shall be limited to 15 pages. The Court will rule on Defendants' motion #29 via CM/ECF. The joint status report remains due on 08/05/2021. Mailed notice (axc)
July 27, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant JJMT Capital LLC for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Rosenburg, Howard)
July 27, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Joseph DeAlteris, JJMT Capital LLC, Matthew Schweinzger, Jacob Wunderlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Ryan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION by Defendants Joseph DeAlteris, JJMT Capital LLC, Matthew Schweinzger, Jacob Wunderlin for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Ryan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JJMT Capital LLC by Howard J. Rosenburg (Rosenburg, Howard)
July 27, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joseph DeAlteris by John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr (Pavletic, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Schweinzger by John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr (Pavletic, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jacob Wunderlin by John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr (Pavletic, John)
July 27, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joseph DeAlteris by Matthew S Ryan (Ryan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Schweinzger by Matthew S Ryan (Ryan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jacob Wunderlin by Matthew S Ryan (Ryan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Matthew Schweinzger by Terence H. Campbell (Campbell, Terence)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joseph DeAlteris by Terence H. Campbell (Campbell, Terence)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jacob Wunderlin by Terence H. Campbell (Campbell, Terence)
July 1, 2021 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Tyler Crookston. (lxk, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson. Jacob Wunderlin waiver sent on 5/28/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson. Joseph DeAlteris waiver sent on 5/28/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson. Matthew Schweinzger waiver sent on 5/28/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Jacob Wunderlin on May 28, 2021 by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson. Waiver of service due by 6/28/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Joseph DeAlteris on May 28, 2021 by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson. Waiver of service due by 6/28/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Matthew Schweinger on May 28, 2021 by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson. Waiver of service due by 6/28/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Plaintiff's request to extend the deadline for the filing of the joint initial status report based on the filing of the amended complaint and the fact that one defendant has not yet been served. The deadline for the parties to file a joint initial status report is 08/05/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson regarding amended complaint #9 (Rubin, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson against All Defendants and Demand for Jury Trial (Frost, Scott)
May 28, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Tyler Crookston (jmk, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #7 and directs Plaintiffs to file their amended complaint by 05/28/2021. Mailed notice (axc).
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson to amend/correct complaint, #1 to add new parties (Rubin, Daniel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson as to JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Rubin, Daniel)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 6/21/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at analeah_charles@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the Joint Initial Status Report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 joint status report) (axc).
April 8, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (txl, )
April 8, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson by Scott C. Frost (Frost, Scott)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Aronson, Steven Aronson by Daniel S. Rubin (Rubin, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rubin, Daniel)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Aronson, Matthew Aronson; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18101169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Rubin, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aronson et al v. JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Aronson
Represented By: Scott C. Frost
Represented By: Daniel S. Rubin
Represented By: Christopher Lee Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Aronson
Represented By: Scott C. Frost
Represented By: Daniel S. Rubin
Represented By: Christopher Lee Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJMT Capital LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJMT Capital LLC
Represented By: Howard J. Rosenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Crookston
Represented By: Ellen M. Wheeler
Represented By: Margaret Gembala Nelson
Represented By: Jena Louise Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Schweinzger
Represented By: Terence H. Campbell
Represented By: John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph DeAlteris
Represented By: Terence H. Campbell
Represented By: John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Wunderlin
Represented By: Matthew S Ryan
Represented By: Terence H. Campbell
Represented By: John Nicholas Pavletic, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?