Zapata v. Jackson
Petitioner: Lazaro E. Zapata
Respondent: Lawrence and Leonta Jackson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01875
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 MAILED copy of order #12 and the judgment order #13 to Petitioner (rp, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/27/2021: The habeas corpus petition #1 , #9 is denied. The court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Enter judgment and terminate civil case. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order and the judgment order to Petitioner. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by Lazaro E. Zapata. (Envelope postmarked 5/5/2021) (lma, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Lazaro E. Zapata of Change of Address. (Envelope postmarked 5/4/2021) (lma, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Lazaro E. Zapata. (Envelope postmarked 4/1/2021) (lma, )
April 14, 2021 MAILED a copy of order #7 , along with the blank in forma pauperis application form, to Petitioner. (lma, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Petitioner has neither paid the $5 filing fee nor filed a petition for leave to file in forma pauperis. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must either pay the $5 filing fee or file a petition for leave to file in forma pauperis by May 18, 2021. Petitioner is warned that the Court may dismiss this case if he fails to comply with this order. The Clerk is instructed to: (1) terminate Respondent Lawrence; (2) add Petitioner's present custodian, Leonta Jackson, Warden, Pontiac Correctional Center as Respondent; (3) alter the case caption to Zapata v. Jackson; and, (4) send Petitioner a blank in forma pauperis application form. Petitioner is instructed to file all future papers concerning this action with the Clerk of Court in care of the Prisoner Correspondent. Any paper that is sent directly to the Judge or otherwise fails to comply with these instructions may be disregarded by the Court or returned to the Petitioner. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to mail a copy of this order, along with the blank in forma pauperis application form, to petitioner. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Lazaro E. Zapata (lma, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Lazaro E. Zapata (lma, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Lazaro E. Zapata. (lma, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing by Lazaro E. Zapata. (lma, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Lazaro E. Zapata. (Envelope postmarked 4/1/2021) (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lazaro E. Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?