Medley et al v. Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.
Plaintiff: Carlos Ousley-Brown, Aaron Medley and Tristan Medley
Defendant: Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. d/b/a Saratoga Food Specialties doing business as Saratoga Food Specialties
Case Number: 1:2021cv01919
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court has been notified that the parties have agreed in principle to settle this case. All previously set deadlines are stayed while the parties finalize the settlement. The status hearing set for 6/14/21 at 8:45 a.m. is stricken and reset to 6/17/21 at 9:00 a.m. If the parties file a stipulation to dismiss the case prior to the status hearing, the status hearing will be stricken. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. Notice of Settlement (Kracht, Torsten)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jn, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendant Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.'s motion for extension of time to file answer to and including 5/31/21 is granted #5 . Joint initial status report due date and initial status hearing date to stand. Mailed notice (cc, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aaron Medley, Tristan Medley, Carlos Ousley-Brown by Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 6/14/21 at 8:45 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 6/8/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. Mailed notice (cn).
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. for extension of time to file answer (Kracht, Torsten)
April 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kracht, Torsten)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. by Torsten M. Kracht (Kracht, Torsten)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. Notice of Affiliates (Kracht, Torsten)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from State of Illinois Circuit Court, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, Will County, case number (2021CH000060) filed by Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18111646. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Summons)(Kracht, Torsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medley et al v. Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ousley-Brown
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Medley
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Medley
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. d/b/a Saratoga Food Specialties doing business as Saratoga Food Specialties
Represented By: Torsten M. Kracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?