Brisco v. Brown, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Melanise Brisco and Melanice Brisco
Defendant: Arlette Brown, M.D., United States of America and METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 1:2021cv01936
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY by Defendant United States of America (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The court has reviewed the initial joint status report. Briefing schedule on motion to dismiss remains set. Mailed notice\. (dm, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS Report (joint) by United States of America (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of the United States' amended motion to dismiss #10 , the motion to dismiss filed on 4/12/21 #4 is denied as moot. Briefing schedule set on 4/13/21 #5 remains set. In light of the Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action and Substitution of the United States as defendant #9 , the United States is substituted as the sole federal party defendant in place of defendant Dr. Arlette Brown, M.D., pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 233(c). The Clerk is directed to substitute the United States for Defendant Dr. Brown. Motion by the United States to correct the docket regarding its attorney designation #11 is granted. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect that the United States Attorney represents only the United States and not any other party. Attorney appearances on behalf of Defendants Metrosouth Medical Center and Dr. Arlette Brown are terminated. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to address her position regarding the status Metrosouth Medical Center as a defendant in the status report due on 5/12/21. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to amend/correct attorney designation #3 (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants United States of America, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, Arlette Brown, M.D. to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies #4 (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 7115) filed by United States of America (Amended) (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 5/12/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ec, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Paraisia Rene Winston Gray on behalf of All Defendants regarding set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings #5 (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Response to motion to dismiss due 5/30/21, reply due 6/11/21. Defense counsel is directed to serve this order on counsel for the plaintiff via mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendants United States of America, METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, Arlette Brown, M.D. to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Paraisia Rene Winston Gray as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Arlette Brown, M.D., METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, United States of America (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 7115) filed by Arlette Brown, M.D., METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, United States of America (Winston Gray, Paraisia)
April 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brisco v. Brown, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlette Brown, M.D.
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROSOUTH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Paraisia Rene Winston Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanise Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanice Brisco
Represented By: Naderh H Elrabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?