United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $385,840 in United States currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $385,840 in United States currency
Claimant: Adam Doyle and Stephen M Komie
Case Number: 1:2021cv02100
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881 Forfeiture of Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: On review of the parties' joint status report (doc. #29 ), a further joint status report is due and to be filed by noon on 5/16/22 as to settlement status. Mailed notice. (jj, )
April 15, 2022 Filing 29 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
April 7, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The telephone status hearing set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/08/22 before Magistrate Judge Fuentes is stricken and converted to a joint status report due and to be filed by no later than noon on 4/15/22. Mailed notice. (jj, )
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The Court has reviewed the parties' most recent status report (doc. #26 ) indicating that a settlement in this matter has been reached and that the parties are currently completing settlement documentation and execution of a final settlement agreement. The Court appreciates that counsel for the parties appears to have worked out an agreement, as they first disclosed to the Court nearly four months ago (doc. #22 ). At this point, the process of completing settlement documentation and dismissal of this matter should be wrapped up promptly or, if settlement cannot materialize, the Court ought to resume discovery scheduling. Rather than schedule another status report in 60 days as the parties have suggested, the Court sets a telephonic status hearing roughly 30 days from now, at 10 a.m. on 4/8/22, for a report on settlement progress. The Court will vacate the hearing if a stipulation to dismiss is on file by then. The call-in number for the pretrial conference hearing is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 2006804. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (cn).
March 7, 2022 Filing 26 STATUS Report by United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
January 10, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: On review of the parties' status report (doc. #24 ), the next joint written status report is due and to be filed by noon on 3/7/22 but will be vacated if a stipulation to dismiss is on file by then. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 24 STATUS Report by United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
December 8, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The parties having previously reported (doc. #22 ) that they have reached an agreement to settle the matter and would like up to 60 days from their November 2021 report to provide an additional joint written status report update, the Court orders the parties to file a further joint status report by noon on 1/7/22 as to the status of settlement finalization, and if a stipulation to dismiss is on file by then, the report date will be vacated. Mailed notice. (jj, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The parties' agreed motion to extend the written discovery cutoff 90 to 120 days so that the parties may continue with settlement negotiations (doc. #20 ) is granted. The discovery cutoff is extended to 1/24/22. The parties are to file a joint status report by 11/8/21 apprising the Court of the status of settlement negotiations and informing the Court whether the parties would be interested in obtaining the assistance of the Court in settling this matter. Mailed notice. (jj, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for extension of time (Agreed) (Chmura, Anthony)
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The case having been reassigned to this Court on consent (doc. #18 ), the referral is hereby terminated. All other deadlines and orders as stated in the minute order dated 7/15/21 (doc. #15 ) remain unchanged. Mailed notice. (jj, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 7/22/2021. (bg, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Chmura, Anthony)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Komie, Stephen)
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: This matter coming before the magistrate judge on referral for discovery supervision and settlement (doc. #13 ), and the parties having moved in their joint status report (doc. #12 ) for a 90-day discovery stay while they exchange discovery informally and discuss a possible settlement, the motion is granted. No discovery schedule is set at this time, but the Court will consider entering the proposed schedule set forth in the in the 7/9/21 status report (doc. #12 ) for entry in late September 2021, nearly 90 days from now, after the parties file as directed a joint written status report, by noon on 9/24/21, on settlement status and whether the parties request a settlement conference. In the event settlement is not imminent, the parties should be prepared for a discovery schedule consistent with the one they proposed in their 7/9/21 status report. In the meantime, the parties are directed to review the Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Magistrate Judge Fuentes, Standing Order for Settlement Conferences, and Top Ten Ways to Defeat Settlement, all available on the Court's website. Further, insofar as the parties have indicated that they wish to consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, they should promptly file a fully executed Joint Consent form on the docket to that effect. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice.
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge Fuentes. Mailed notice (axc).
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 General Denial and ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Stephen M Komie against United States of America . by Stephen M Komie(Komie, Stephen)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 General Denial and ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Adam Doyle against United States of America . by Adam Doyle(Komie, Stephen)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Stephen M Komie by Stephen M. Komie (Komie, Stephen)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Adam Doyle by Stephen M. Komie (Komie, Stephen)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 CLAIM by Stephen M Komie regarding complaint #1 (Komie, Stephen)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 CLAIM by Adam Doyle regarding complaint #1 (Komie, Stephen)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 7/12/2021, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. If no Claimants have appeared by that date, the Government should submit the status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report.' Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 joint status report) (axc).
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Anthony Chmura as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Chmura, Anthony)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 WARRANT For Arrest In Rem to Fund In The Amount of $385,840 In United States Currency. (aee, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chmura, Anthony)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Chmura, Anthony)
April 19, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $385,840 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $385,840 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Chmura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adam Doyle
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen M Komie
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?