Miller v. Hastert et al
Plaintiff: Erik Miller
Defendant: Dale Hastert and U R, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02143
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court adopts in part the parties' proposed case management schedule, see #13 , as follows: the parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 7/9/21, issue written discovery by 8/6/21, and complete fact discovery by 1/31/22. The deadline for amendments to pleadings (to add claims, parties, etc.) is 10/29/21. The parties shall file an updated status report by 12/20/21 confirming that they are on track to meet the 1/31/22 fact discovery deadline, indicating whether they in fact require expert discovery, and indicating whether any party will seek summary judgment. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS Report JOINT by Erik Miller (Shapiro, Michael)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dale Hastert, U R, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Spellmire, George)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #9 ; Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/3/21. The 5/20/21 Notice of Motion date is stricken. The parties shall file their status report by 6/10/21. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by George William Spellmire for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/20/2021 at 11:00 AM. (Spellmire, George)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Dale Hastert, U R, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Spellmire, George)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dale Hastert, U R, Inc. by George William Spellmire (Spellmire, George)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Miller as to U R, Inc. on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Shapiro, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Miller as to Dale Hastert served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Miller as to Dale Hastert on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Shapiro, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 5/21/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 22, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dale Hastert, U R, Inc. (jmk, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erik Miller by Michael P Tomlinson (Tomlinson, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erik Miller by Michael Samuel Shapiro (Shapiro, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shapiro, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Erik Miller; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18153097.(Shapiro, Michael)
April 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Hastert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Hastert
Represented By: George William Spellmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U R, Inc.
Represented By: George William Spellmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Miller
Represented By: Michael Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Michael P Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?