Bankhead v. Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darius Bankhead
Defendant: Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02217
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed third motion for an extension of time to file its responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint #13 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 7/26/2021. The parties are directed to file the initial joint status report by 7/30/2021. (rao, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Naber, Jennifer)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed second motion for an extension of time to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint #11 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 6/24/2021. The parties are directed to file the initial joint status report by 6/30/2021. (rao, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. for extension of time (Second Unopposed) to File Its Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Naber, Jennifer)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed first motion for an extension of time to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 5/25/2021. The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (exr, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. (Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darius Bankhead by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. by Alexandra McNicholas (McNicholas, Alexandra)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. re notice of removal, #1 to Plaintiff (Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. by Jennifer Anne Naber (Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021ch01325) filed by Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18173785. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summonses, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Filings, #3 Declaration C: Wimpey Declaration)(Naber, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankhead v. Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Bankhead
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Steel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Naber
Represented By: Alexandra McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?