Long v. Nasco Healthcare Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Long
Defendant: Nasco Healthcare Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02320
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18375995. (Obenberger, Thomas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure of Affiliates STATEMENT by Nasco Healthcare Inc. (Tedrowe, Courtney)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Nasco Healthcare Inc.(Tedrowe, Courtney)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Long by John C. Ellis (Ellis, John)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nasco Healthcare Inc. by Carolyn E Isaac (Isaac, Carolyn)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nasco Healthcare Inc. by Courtney D Tedrowe (Tedrowe, Courtney)
April 30, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Nasco Healthcare Inc. (acm, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Long by Justin DeLuca (DeLuca, Justin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeLuca, Justin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Long; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18191478.(DeLuca, Justin)
April 29, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Nasco Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasco Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn E Isaac
Represented By: Thomas E. Obenberger
Represented By: Courtney D Tedrowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Long
Represented By: Justin DeLuca
Represented By: John C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?