Boyd v. City of Country Club Hills et al
Plaintiff: Madeline Boyd
Defendant: City of Country Club Hills, Police Officer Ronald Shelton and Police Officer Katrina Meletis
Case Number: 1:2021cv02472
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by Raymond John Byrne (Byrne, Raymond)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by Laura Lee Scarry (Scarry, Laura)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by James L. DeAno (DeAno, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 7/20/2021 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Shelton, Katrina Meletis, City of Country Club Hills. Ronald Shelton waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (DeAno, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Shelton, Katrina Meletis, City of Country Club Hills. Katrina Meletis waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (DeAno, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Country Club Hills. City of Country Club Hills waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (DeAno, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by Raymond John Byrne (Byrne, Raymond)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by Laura Lee Scarry (Scarry, Laura)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City of Country Club Hills, Katrina Meletis, Ronald Shelton by James L. DeAno (DeAno, James)
May 7, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Madeline Boyd by Edward M. Fox (Fox, Edward)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Madeline Boyd by Garrett W. Browne (Browne, Garrett)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Madeline Boyd; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18221563. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Browne, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. City of Country Club Hills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Country Club Hills
Represented By: James L. DeAno
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Represented By: Raymond John Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Ronald Shelton
Represented By: James L. DeAno
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Represented By: Raymond John Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Katrina Meletis
Represented By: James L. DeAno
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Represented By: Raymond John Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Boyd
Represented By: Garrett W. Browne
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?